EP1609164 - RESISTIVE CANTILEVER SPRING FOR PROBE MICROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Israelachvili, Jacob Nissim 2233 Foothill Lane Santa Barbara California 93105 / US | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Flutter, Paula EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2014/24] |
Former [2009/36] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2005/52] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03708379.7 | 13.03.2003 | [2005/52] | WO2003IB00913 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004070765 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1609164 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/00 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
G01Q60/26 (EP);
G01Q20/04 (EP);
G01Q60/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESISTIVE CANTILEVERFEDER FÜR SONDENMIKROSKOPIE | [2005/52] | English: | RESISTIVE CANTILEVER SPRING FOR PROBE MICROSCOPY | [2005/52] | French: | RESSORT EN PORTE-A-FAUX RESISTIF POUR LA MICROSCOPIE PAR SONDE | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 31.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0869329 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 3-9 * * page 5, line 25 - page 13, line 29 *[A] 3,6,7; | [X]US5959200 (CHUI BENJAMIN W [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * figure 5 * * column 6, line 25 - line 50 *; | [X]US2001028033 (SHIMIZU NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0074] * | International search | [X]US5444244 ; | [X]US5705814 |