EP1516386 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONNECTING BATTERY CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enersys Energy Products Inc. 617 North Ridgeview Drive Warrensburg, MO 64093 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states EnerSys Energy Products Inc. 617 North Ridgeview Drive Warrensburg, MO 64093 / US | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Modular Energy Devices Inc. 9 General Stanton Drive Charlestown, RI 02813 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EAVES, Stephen, S. 9 General Stanton Drive Charlestown, RI 02813 / US | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Boyce, Conor FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2005/12] | Boyce, Conor F.R. Kelly & Co, 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge, Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 03708995.0 | 07.02.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003US03630 | Priority number, date | US20020355883P | 11.02.2002 Original published format: US 355883 P | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03069717 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1516386 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44, H01M10/48 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
H01M10/4207 (EP,US);
B60L3/0046 (EP,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
B60L58/22 (EP,US);
B60L58/27 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H01M10/615 (EP,US);
H01M10/637 (EP,US);
H01M10/6571 (EP,US);
B60L2210/30 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP,US);
B60L2240/549 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND METHODEN ZUR VERBINDUNG VON BATTERIEZELLEN | [2005/12] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONNECTING BATTERY CELLS | [2005/12] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE CONSTRUCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE BATTERIE | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/11] | 06.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4287267 (WHITTLESEY CURTIS C, et al) [X] 1-29 * column 2, line 44 - line 43; figure 6 ** column 5, line 48 - line 58 *; | [X]US5422558 (STEWART NEAL G [HK]) [X] 1-29 * column 3, line 48 - line 64; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0932240 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-29 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP1150132 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-29 * column 6, line 14 - line 39; figure 1; claim 1 * |