Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006086181 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5362705 | 08.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005144042 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35847702 | 19.02.2002 | US36829503 | 18.02.2003 | US5362705 | 08.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003233250 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35847702 | 19.02.2002 | US36829503 | 18.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005527884 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US35847702 | 19.02.2002 | US0304929 | 18.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1846859 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US03352 | 31.01.2006 | US5362705 | 08.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003213123 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2003 | A8 | AU2003213123 | 09.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35847702 | 19.02.2002 | US0304929 | 18.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1493115 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US35847702 | 19.02.2002 | US0304929 | 18.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03071391 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2004 | A3 | WO03071391 | 28.08.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US35847702 | 19.02.2002 |