EP1467766 - DERMATOLOGICAL WATER-RESISTANT COMPOSITIONS WITH SUN SCREENS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE OF SUCH COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ellipse Pharmaceuticals 4, allée du DoyenGeorges Brus 33600 Pessac / FR | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACAZE, Catherine 13, rue du Colonel Bordes F-33510 Andernos / FR | 02 /
CUART, Sylvie 20, rue Neuve F-33600 Pessac / FR | 03 /
TERRASSIN, Laurent 30, rue du Béarn F-33700 Mérignac / FR | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Fantin, Laurent, et al Aquinov Allée de la Forestière 33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Fantin, Laurent, et al AQUINOV Allée de la Forestière 33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | ||
Former [2004/43] | Fantin, Laurent, et al Société AQUINOV 12, rue Condorcet 33150 Cenon / FR | Application number, filing date | 03709889.4 | 20.01.2003 | [2004/43] | WO2003FR00158 | Priority number, date | FR20020000727 | 22.01.2002 Original published format: FR 0200727 | [2004/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03061707 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467766 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/02, A61K47/14, A61K7/42 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K47/02 (EP);
A61K47/14 (EP);
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERBESTÄNDIGE DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT LICHTSCHUTZMITTEL, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2004/43] | English: | DERMATOLOGICAL WATER-RESISTANT COMPOSITIONS WITH SUN SCREENS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE OF SUCH COMPOSITIONS | [2004/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DERMATOLOGIQUES, RESISTANCES A L EAU, AVEC FILT RES SOLAIRES, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET UTILISATIONS DE CES COMPOSITIONS | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5660839 (ALLEC JOSIANE [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,11 * claims 1,10,13 * * column 3, line 36 - line 40 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 7 *; | [X]EP0747042 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10 * claims 1-6 * * page 10, line 21 - line 22 * * page 11, line 21 - line 26 * * page 20; example 4 * * page 22; example 8 *; | [X]EP0586106 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * page 24; example 16 * * page 27; examples 17A,17F *; | [A]WO9640144 (PHARMAVENE INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |