EP1490551 - IMPROVEMENTS TO PROCESSES FOR MANUFACTURING PAPER PRODUCTS BY IMPROVING THE PHYSICO-CHEMICAL BEHAVIOUR OF THE PAPER STOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUGUET, Michel 42, rue des Tamaris F-78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
DE RIGAUD, Jean-Mathieu 48, boulevard Boulay Paty F-44100 Nantes / FR | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Conan, Philippe Claude L'Air Liquide SA Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Conan, Philippe Claude L'Air Liquide SA Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03710066.6 | 03.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003IB00818 | Priority number, date | FR20020002880 | 07.03.2002 Original published format: FR 0202880 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03074788 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1490551 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/10 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
D21H23/10 (EP);
D21H17/65 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPIERPRODUKTEN DURCH VERBESSERUNG DES PHYSIKALISCH-CHEMISCHEN VERHALTENS DES PAPIERSTOFFS | [2005/01] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS TO PROCESSES FOR MANUFACTURING PAPER PRODUCTS BY IMPROVING THE PHYSICO-CHEMICAL BEHAVIOUR OF THE PAPER STOCK | [2005/01] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES AUX PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE PRODUITS EN PAPIER PAR AMELIORATION DU COMPORTEMENT PHYSICO-CHIMIQUE DE LA PATE A PAPIER | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0884416 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0281273 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9954741 (HONEYWELL MEASUREX CORP [US]) | by applicant | EP0884416 |