EP1500101 - METHOD OF COPY DETECTION AND PROTECTION USING TIME JUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTVELSEN, Petrus, H., C. c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VOLLEBREGT, Paulus, F. c/o Prof . Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03710134.2 | 01.04.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003IB01365 | Priority number, date | EP20020076517 | 18.04.2002 Original published format: EP 02076517 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088242 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500101 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G11B19/12 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
G11B20/0063 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B19/12 (KR);
G11B20/00 (KR);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOPIERDETEKTION UND -SCHUTZVERFAHREN MITTELS ZEITSPRÜNGEN | [2005/04] | English: | METHOD OF COPY DETECTION AND PROTECTION USING TIME JUMPS | [2005/04] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE COPIE ET DE PROTECTION AU MOYEN DE SAUTS TEMPORELS | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 02.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9803973 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-10* page 10, line 15 - line 29; figure 7 *; | [A]WO9854713 (DILLA LIMITED C [GB]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]EP0899733 (SONY DADC AUSTRIA AG [AT]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 13 - line 27 *; | [X]US6104679 (SOLLISH BARUCH [IL]) [X] 1-10 * column 8, line 51 - column 10, line 6 *; | [A]WO0161695 (MACROVISION EUROP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 11, line 4 - line 32; figures 7-10 *; | [A]WO0180546 (MIDBAR TECH LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 9 *; | [A]US6311305 (SOLLISH BARUCH [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 20 - line 44 *; | [A]WO0211136 (MACROVISION EUROP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 6; claim 1 * |