EP1482766 - HIGH FREQUENCY HEATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Kohei 4-18-3-104, Fuchu-cho Izumi-shi, Osaka 594-0071 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Koji 3-6-15, Nishishoji Minoo-shi, Osaka 562-0003 / JP | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03710236.5 | 03.03.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003JP02446 | Priority number, date | JP20020057288 | 04.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002057288 | JP20030046777 | 25.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003046777 | [2004/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03075614 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1482766 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482766 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/68 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
H05B6/666 (EP,US);
H05B6/66 (KR);
H05B6/68 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/22] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZ-HEIZVORRICHTUNG | [2004/49] | English: | HIGH FREQUENCY HEATING APPARATUS | [2004/49] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE HAUTE FREQUENCE | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2004 | Translation filed | 30.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3780252 (WYTHE CRAPUCHETTES P) [X] 4 * abstract * [A] 1; | [A]US4300032 (NIU TOKIHIDE, et al) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS5329001 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]US4524258 (AOKI MASAYUKI [JP]); | [Y]US4539453 (MIYAZAKI KOICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]JPS617589 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS63284791 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH1183023 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) | by applicant | US3780252 |