EP1486331 - PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR AND FLUID INJECTION HEAD HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Junhua c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
KATAKURA, Takahiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/51] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03710386.8 | 17.03.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003JP03153 | Priority number, date | JP20020075087 | 18.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002075087 | JP20020199178 | 08.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002199178 | JP20030069235 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003069235 | [2004/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03078166 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486331 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486331 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045, B41J2/055, H01L41/09 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/14233 (EP,US);
B41J2/161 (EP,US);
B41J2/1632 (EP,US);
H10N30/2047 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14258 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHES STELLGLIED UND DIESES AUFWEISENDER FLUIDEINSPRITZKOPF | [2004/51] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR AND FLUID INJECTION HEAD HAVING THE SAME | [2004/51] | French: | ACTIONNEUR PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE ET TETE D'INJECTION DE FLUIDE EQUIPEE DE CELUI-CI | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2004 | Translation filed | 28.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2011 | BE | 12.01.2011 | CY | 12.01.2011 | CZ | 12.01.2011 | DK | 12.01.2011 | EE | 12.01.2011 | FI | 12.01.2011 | HU | 12.01.2011 | IT | 12.01.2011 | NL | 12.01.2011 | RO | 12.01.2011 | SE | 12.01.2011 | SI | 12.01.2011 | SK | 12.01.2011 | TR | 12.01.2011 | IE | 17.03.2011 | LU | 17.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | BG | 12.04.2011 | GR | 13.04.2011 | ES | 23.04.2011 | PT | 12.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
TR | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 17.03.2011 | ||
LU | 17.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 17.03.2011 | ||
LU | 17.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
IE | 17.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | SE | 12.01.2011 | |
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0969530 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) | International search | [X]EP0709195 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]); | [X]JPH08118630 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD); | [X]JPH09277531 (RICOH KK); | [X]JPH09323410 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [X]JPH11207975 (BROTHER IND LTD) |