Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1489747
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.07.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
02.05.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.03.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.10.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.07.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.06.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] |
25.05.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
25.05.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
06.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
05.11.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
19.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|