Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7049994 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2006 | B2 | US2005068217 | 31.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0303240 | 18.03.2003 | JP2002079960 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2003081781 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0303240 | 18.03.2003 | JP2002079960 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1489747 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2005 | A4 | EP1489747 | 22.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0303240 | 18.03.2003 | JP2002079960 | 22.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03081781 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2002079960 | 22.03.2002 |