EP1489747 - SEMICONDUCTOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thine Electronics, Inc. 3-3-6, Nihombashi-Honcho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Thine Electronics, Inc. 3-3-6, Nihombashi-Honcho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUJITA, Tatsuo, c/o THINE ELECTRONICS INC. 3-3-6, Nihombashi-Honcho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03710410.6 | 18.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003JP03240 | Priority number, date | JP20020079960 | 22.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002079960 | [2004/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03081781 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1489747 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/06, H03M1/12, H04N5/14 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
H04N5/14 (EP,US);
H03M1/066 (EP,US);
H04N5/12 (EP,US);
H03M1/1215 (EP,US);
H03M1/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE HALBLEITERSCHALTUNG | [2004/52] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT | [2004/52] | French: | CIRCUIT INTEGRE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2004 | Translation filed | 21.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 20.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/33] | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH0346883 ; | [Y]JPS63121385 ; | [A]JPH05110992 ; | [A]EP0457329 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO9720304 (MICRON DISPLAY TECH INC [US]) [X] 9 * figure 7 *; | [Y]US5764299 (JENNES JOS [BE], et al) [Y] 5,6,12,13 * column 7, line 24 - line 37 *; | [X]US5995031 (OKUDA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 9 * column 3, line 48 - line 53 *; | [X]EP1043839 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,9 * figure 5 *; | [Y]EP1058234 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,6,12,13 * paragraph [0021] *; | [X]US2001052864 (SHIMIZU ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0035] *; | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910514), vol. 015, no. 187, Database accession no. (E - 1067), & JP03046883 A 19910228 (SHIMADZU CORP) [DX] 1-4 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881004), vol. 012, no. 369, Database accession no. (E - 665), & JP63121385 A 19880525 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 5,6,12,13 * abstract * | [X] - HUAWEN JIN ET AL, "Time-interleaved A/D converter with channel randomization", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1997. ISCAS '97., PROCEEDINGS OF 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HONG KONG 9-12 JUNE 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970609), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3583-X, pages 425 - 428, XP010236066 [X] 1,4 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1997.608758 | [X] - PETRAGLIA A ET AL, "Effects of quantization noise in parallel arrays of analog-to-digital converters", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 1994. ISCAS '94., 1994 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON LONDON, UK 30 MAY-2 JUNE 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19940530), vol. 5, ISBN 0-7803-1915-X, pages 337 - 340, XP010143334 [X] 4 * page 337, column 2, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1994.409375 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930826), vol. 017, no. 470, Database accession no. (E - 1422), & JP05110992 A 19930430 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH0346883 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JPH1131969 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |