Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IT | | LI | | LU | | MC | | NL | | PT | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Examination procedure | 11.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | | 23.07.2004 | Search fee paid | | 23.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 23.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 14   M06  
Fee paid on  
27.04.2016 | 31.01.2017 | 15   M06  
Fee paid on  
27.02.2017 | European patent granted | 20.03.2019 | Opposition procedure | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2020 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 27.10.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040723 | | Event date: | 27.10.2004 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 27.10.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | AL LT LV MK RO | | Event date: | 02.02.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | LOS ANGELES BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH INSTITUTEAT HARBOR | | Event date: | 02.02.2005 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY | | Event date: | 27.02.2008 | | Event description: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20080125 | | Event date: | 04.06.2008 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20080505 | | Event date: | 18.07.2018 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20180619 | | Event date: | 21.11.2018 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED) | | Event date: | 12.12.2018 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20181113 | | Event date: | 20.03.2019 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 20.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 29.03.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 04.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 60351878 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Event date: | 15.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 1109822 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20190415 | | Event date: | 17.04.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 20.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20190513 | | Event date: | 31.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | VALIPAT S.A. C/O BOVARD SA NEUCHATEL, CH | | Event date: | 11.06.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 12.06.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL FP | Code Expl.: | TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY) | | Event date: | 15.07.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E017411 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20190517 | | Event date: | 28.08.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E043346 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 26.08.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20190401548 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20190708 | | Event date: | 03.09.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 31087 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 16.10.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2727450 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20191016 | | Event date: | 04.06.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A 1469879 PT 20190604 T | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20190520 | | Event date: | 02.01.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 60351878 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Event date: | 26.02.2020 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20200102 | | Event date: | 15.02.2019 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 12.11.2018 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 16.10.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Event date: | 16.10.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION RELATED TO PAYMENT OF FEE FOR PUBLISHING/PRINTING DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR3 | | Event date: | 10.10.2018 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 18.06.2018 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 10.09.2004 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 24.01.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 15.08.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 1109822 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | Effective DATE: | 20190320 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20211220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20211222 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20211230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20211220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20211222 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 31.01.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20211221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 24.01.2020 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 04.04.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20220127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20211221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20220202 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20220127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20220127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20220127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20220127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20220101 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20220127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20220127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20211221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20220201 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20220125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20220127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20220119 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20220126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20220127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20220103 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.06.2022 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20211221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 03.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 60351878 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 04.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20230102 | | Event date: | 09.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EUP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT EXPIRED | Expiry DATE: | 20230103 | | Event date: | 13.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 25.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20230102 | | Event date: | 25.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK MK4A E 31087 SK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED | Expiry DATE: | 20230103 | | Event date: | 31.01.2023 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20230103 | | Event date: | 31.01.2023 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20230102 | | Event date: | 15.02.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK07 1109822 AT T | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY | Effective DATE: | 20230103 | | Event date: | 24.01.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20230103 | | Event date: | 28.02.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE EUG | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 28.02.2023 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20230104 | | Event date: | 28.04.2023 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20230103 | | Event date: | 28.04.2023 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20230113 | | Event date: | 04.05.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20230504 | | Event date: | 31.05.2023 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20230103 | | Event date: | 31.07.2023 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20230104 | |