EP1480710 - AUTONOMOUS, AMBULATORY ANALYTE MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/49] | AUTONOMOUS, AMBULATORY ANALYTE MONITOR OR DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | ||
[2016/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuity Medical, Inc. 526 Almanor Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2017/19] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Intuity Medical, Inc. 10161 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Rosedale Medical, Inc. 10161 Bubb Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Rosedale Medical, Inc. 3000 Sand Hill Road, Building 4, Suite 210 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACETI, John, Gregory 7 Monroe Drive West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US | 02 /
MCBRIDE, Sterling, Eduard 11 Carlyle Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
MORONEY, Richard, Morgan, III 3 Kensington Court Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
GREGORY, Christopher, Carter 1321 Wrightstown Road Newtown, PA 18940 / US | 05 /
ZANZUCCHI, Peter, John 13 Jill Drive Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | ||
Former [2005/42] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03710880.0 | 07.02.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003US03536 | Priority number, date | US20020355195P | 08.02.2002 Original published format: US 355195 P | US20020131268 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: US 131268 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03066128 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1480710 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480710 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/150984 (US);
A61B5/1411 (US);
A61B5/14514 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150076 (EP,US);
A61B5/150213 (EP,US);
A61B5/150389 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150526 (EP,US);
A61B5/150755 (EP,US);
A61B5/15087 (EP,US);
A61B5/150969 (EP,US);
A61B5/15109 (EP,US);
A61B5/15119 (EP,US);
A61B5/15123 (EP,US);
A61B5/15146 (EP,US);
A61B5/15153 (EP,US);
A61B5/15163 (EP,US);
A61B5/155 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
A61B5/6833 (EP,US);
A61M37/0015 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0412 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0443 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUTONOMER, AMBULANTER ANALYTENMONITOR | [2016/37] | English: | AUTONOMOUS, AMBULATORY ANALYTE MONITOR | [2016/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE D'ANALYTE | [2016/37] |
Former [2004/49] | AUTONOMER, AMBULANTER ANALYTENMONITOR ODER VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE VON ARZNEIMITTELN | ||
Former [2004/49] | AUTONOMOUS, AMBULATORY ANALYTE MONITOR OR DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | ||
Former [2004/49] | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE D'ANALYTE OU D'ADMINISTRATION DE MEDICAMENT AMBULATOIRE AUTONOME | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.04.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11195415.2 / EP2471570 | EP11195925.0 / EP2471571 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 19.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2003 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | NL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | LU | 07.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 07.02.2003 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5801057 (SMART WILSON H [US], et al) [A] 1,45 * column 3, line 32 - line 43 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 16 *; | [A]WO0074763 (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US]) [A] 45* abstract *; | [Y]WO0172220 (USF FILTRATION & SEPARATIONS [US]) [Y] 1-19,34-44 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 31 * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 6 *; | [YA]WO0200101 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [Y] 1-19,34-44 * page 4, line 3 - line 18 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 2 * * page 11, line 12 - page 16, line 13 * [A] 45 | International search | [A]US5299571 (MASTROTOTARO JOHN J [US]); | [A]US5390671 (LORD PETER C [US], et al); | [A]US5482473 (LORD PETER C [US], et al); | [A]US5586553 (HALILI EDGARDO C [US], et al); | [A]US5951521 (MASTROTOTARO JOHN J [US], et al); | [A]US6254586 (MANN ALFRED E [US], et al); | [AE]US6537243 (HENNING TIMOTHY P [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0172220 | WO0200101 | US2002006355 |