Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8734792 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2014 | B2 | US2012301472 | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US37248103 | 21.02.2003 | US201213467235 | 09.05.2012 | US89074307 | 06.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008118505 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US37248103 | 21.02.2003 | US89074307 | 06.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007264260 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US37179703 | 21.02.2003 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US59275006 | 03.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7331508 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2008 | B2 | US2006124507 | 15.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35441902 | 05.02.2002 | US35912502 | 22.02.2002 | US23486405 | 23.09.2005 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US35934903 | 05.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004001828 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US37179703 | 21.02.2003 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003202975 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US37248103 | 21.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6948617 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2005 | B2 | US2003146130 | 07.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35441902 | 05.02.2002 | US35912502 | 22.02.2002 | US35934903 | 05.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20040094705 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US0305549 | 21.02.2003 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005526501 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US0305549 | 21.02.2003 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005526044 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US0305323 | 21.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1485130 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2006 | A4 | EP1485130 | 15.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US0305549 | 21.02.2003 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003224624B | Global Dossier | 28.08.2008 | B2 | AU2003224624 | 09.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US0305549 | 21.02.2003 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003215365 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US0305323 | 21.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1476120 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2010 | B1 | EP1476120 | 28.12.2005 | A4 | EP1476120 | 17.11.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US0305323 | 21.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE482719T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US0305323 | 21.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2418450 | 30.01.2007 | C | CA2418450 | 05.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35441902 | 05.02.2002 | US35912502 | 22.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2475509 | 04.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US0305323 | 21.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2476776 | 04.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US0305549 | 21.02.2003 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1646161 | 27.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US0305549 | 21.02.2003 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60334364D1 | 11.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | US0305323 | 21.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA03001153 | 03.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US35441902 | 05.02.2002 | US35912502 | 22.02.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03072736 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2003 | A3 | WO03072736 | 04.09.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03072036 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2003 | A3 | WO03072036 | 04.09.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009221224 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US42047202 | 21.10.2002 | US35941902 | 21.02.2002 |