|
10.08.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.01.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2008 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
80 |