Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004076499 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7829646 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2010 | B2 | US2006079656 | 13.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22778605 | 15.09.2005 | US99772704 | 23.11.2004 | US32180102 | 16.12.2002 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7208441 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2007 | B2 | US2005288470 | 29.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99772705 | 02.03.2005 | US32180102 | 16.12.2002 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6867278 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2005 | B2 | US2003199648 | 23.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37364803 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003215387 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1601701 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2010 | B1 | EP1601701 | 24.09.2008 | A4 | EP1601701 | 07.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE483736T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0318135 | 16.04.2013 | B8 | BR0318135 | 19.02.2013 | B1 | BR0318135 | 20.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2516668 | 03.01.2012 | C | CA2516668 | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100577693C | 06.01.2010 | C | CN1745109 | 08.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101429300B | 17.08.2011 | B | CN101429300 | 13.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60334501D1 | 18.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2369458T | 01.12.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1085491 | 25.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05009043 | 23.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0305456 | 24.02.2003 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6875835 | 05.04.2005 | B2 | US2003236366 | 25.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32180102 | 16.12.2002 | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6525148 | 25.02.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US64086800 | 18.08.2000 |