blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1485441

EP1485441 - AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS FOR ANTIOXIDANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  03.07.2009
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 29.06.2022  [2022/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/43]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2008/21]For all designated states
Ciba Holding Inc.
Klybeckstrasse 141
4057 Basel / CH
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc.
Klybeckstrasse 141
4057 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / THIBAUT, Daniel
2, rue Alma
F-68730 Blotzheim / FR
 [2004/51]
Application number, filing date03712000.313.03.2003
[2004/51]
WO2003EP02619
Priority number, dateEP2002040521821.03.2002         Original published format: EP 02405218
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO03081690
Date:02.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1485441
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1485441
Date:01.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/05]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1485441
Date:05.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.2004
ClassificationIPC:C09J7/02, C08K5/134, C08F8/00, C08K5/09, C08K5/13, C08K5/098, C08J7/04, C09D5/32, C09D133/06, C09D133/00, C09D201/00, C09D167/00
[2004/51]
CPC:
C08J3/21 (EP,US); C09K15/08 (KR); C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08J3/226 (EP,US); C08K5/1345 (EP,US); C09D7/48 (EP,US);
C08J2329/04 (EP,US); C08J2429/00 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08F8/00, C08F16/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/1345, C08L29/04 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WAESSRIGE DISPERSIONEN FUER ANTIOXIDANTIEN[2004/51]
English:AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS FOR ANTIOXIDANTS[2004/51]
French:DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES POUR ANTIOXYDANTS[2004/51]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2004National basic fee paid 
20.08.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
25.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2005Fee for grant paid
28.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.10.2006  07.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Solvay (Société Anonyme)
Rue du Prince Albert, 33
B-1050 Bruxelles / BE
Opponent's representative
Jacques, Philippe, et al, et al
Solvay S.A.
Département de la Propriété Industrielle
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/49]
Opponent(s)01  27.10.2006  07.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Solvay (Société Anonyme)
Rue du Prince Albert, 33
B-1050 Bruxelles / BE
Opponent's representative
Jacques, Philippe, et al, et al
Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Former [2006/49]
Opponent(s)01  27.10.2006   
Solvay (Société Anonyme)
Rue du Prince Albert, 33
B-1050 Bruxelles / BE
Opponent's representative
Jacques, Philippe, et al, et al
Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle Rue de Ransbeek 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
06.12.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.07.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.11.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.03.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.06.2009Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY01.02.2006
EE01.02.2006
TR01.02.2006
LU13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG01.05.2006
[2022/26]
Former [2009/03]CY01.02.2006
EE01.02.2006
LU13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG01.05.2006
Former [2008/37]EE01.02.2006
LU13.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG01.05.2006
Former [2008/28]EE01.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG01.05.2006
Former [2007/45]MC31.03.2006
BG01.05.2006
Former [2007/40]IT01.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG01.05.2006
Former [2006/49]MC31.03.2006
BG01.05.2006
Former [2006/46]MC31.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[Y]GB1366702  (REYNOLDS R J W) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 77 ** examples 1-9; claims 1-20 *;
 [Y]EP0458509  (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 56 * * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0884352  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 4 * * abstract *;
 [X]EP1085069  (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 20 * * abstract *;
 [Y]US6277910  (RASSING JOERGEN [DK], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 30 - column 3, line 32 * * abstract *
OppositionEP0281210
 JPH11349940
 EP1043340
    - "Irganox 1076 - Beilstein Data Sheet"
    - M. FRANCON, Progress in Microscopy, PERGAMON PRESS, (1961), vol. 9, pages 266 - 285
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.