EP1483433 - ANODE FOR OXYGEN EVOLUTION AND RELEVANT SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrie De Nora S.p.A. Via Bistolfi, 35 20134 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Industrie De Nora S.p.A. Via Bistolfi 35 20134 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states DE NORA ELETTRODI S.P.A. Via Dei Canzi, 1 20134 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOJANA, Corrado Via Campogrande 66 I-Valmadrera / IT | 02 /
NEVOSI, Ulderico Via Paladini 55 I-20133 Milan / IT | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/50] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach & Partner (GbR) Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03712007.8 | 13.03.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003EP02643 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI00535 | 14.03.2002 Original published format: IT MI20020535 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03076693 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483433 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483433 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C25C7/02, C25B11/00, C25D17/10 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
C25C7/02 (EP,KR,NO,US);
C25B11/00 (EP,KR,NO,US);
C25D17/10 (KR,NO)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANODE FÜR SAUERSTOFFENTWICKLUNG UND DEREN SUBSTRAT | [2004/50] | English: | ANODE FOR OXYGEN EVOLUTION AND RELEVANT SUBSTRATE | [2004/50] | French: | ANODE POUR LE DEGAGEMENT D'OXYGENE ET SUBSTRAT APPROPRIE | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.02.2010 | CZ | 03.02.2010 | DK | 03.02.2010 | EE | 03.02.2010 | FI | 03.02.2010 | RO | 03.02.2010 | SE | 03.02.2010 | SI | 03.02.2010 | SK | 03.02.2010 | TR | 03.02.2010 | IE | 13.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 03.05.2010 | GR | 04.05.2010 | ES | 14.05.2010 | PT | 03.06.2010 | HU | 04.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 03.02.2010 | |
CZ | 03.02.2010 | ||
DK | 03.02.2010 | ||
EE | 03.02.2010 | ||
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
RO | 03.02.2010 | ||
SE | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
SK | 03.02.2010 | ||
IE | 13.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.05.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
ES | 14.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
HU | 04.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 03.02.2010 | |
CZ | 03.02.2010 | ||
DK | 03.02.2010 | ||
EE | 03.02.2010 | ||
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
RO | 03.02.2010 | ||
SE | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
SK | 03.02.2010 | ||
IE | 13.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.05.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
ES | 14.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 03.02.2010 | |
CZ | 03.02.2010 | ||
DK | 03.02.2010 | ||
EE | 03.02.2010 | ||
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
RO | 03.02.2010 | ||
SE | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
SK | 03.02.2010 | ||
IE | 13.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.05.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
ES | 14.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 03.02.2010 | |
CZ | 03.02.2010 | ||
EE | 03.02.2010 | ||
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
RO | 03.02.2010 | ||
SE | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
SK | 03.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.05.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
ES | 14.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 03.02.2010 | |
CZ | 03.02.2010 | ||
EE | 03.02.2010 | ||
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
RO | 03.02.2010 | ||
SE | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
SK | 03.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
ES | 14.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 03.02.2010 | |
EE | 03.02.2010 | ||
FI | 03.02.2010 | ||
RO | 03.02.2010 | ||
SE | 03.02.2010 | ||
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
ES | 14.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 03.02.2010 | |
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.05.2010 | ||
ES | 14.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 03.02.2010 | |
SI | 03.02.2010 | ||
ES | 14.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 03.02.2010 | |
ES | 14.05.2010 | ||
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | ES | 14.05.2010 | |
PT | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | ES | 14.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1060690 ; | [DX]EP1162288 (DE NORA ELETTRODI SPA [IT]) [DX] 1-3,7,8,11,12,17-19,22,23 * column 7, line 1 - line 43 * * column 8; example 1 * * column 9; example 2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 19, Database accession no. 1998-213284, XP002178481 & JPH1060690 A 19980303 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |