Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005260754 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0302735 | 17.03.2003 | DE10212892 | 20.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2479409 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | C | CA2479409 | 25.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0302735 | 17.03.2003 | DE10212892 | 20.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003218772B | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | B2 | AU2003218772 | 29.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0302735 | 17.03.2003 | DE10212892 | 20.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1487979 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2018 | B2 | EP1487979 | 26.08.2009 | B1 | EP1487979 | 22.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0302735 | 17.03.2003 | DE10212892 | 20.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE440950T | 15.09.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP0302735 | 17.03.2003 | DE10212892 | 20.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50311850D1 | 08.10.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP0302735 | 17.03.2003 | DE10212892 | 20.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03078629 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10212892 | 20.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10212892 | 09.09.2004 | A9 | DE10212892 | 09.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10212892 | 20.03.2002 |