EP1487979 - CONSTRUCTS AND METHODS FOR THE REGULATION OF GENE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Plant Science GmbH Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCK, Michael Am Leutbusch 12 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Jörg Friedrich-Profit-Str. 56 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/29] | Dick, Alexander, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Bad Kreuznacher Strasse 27-29 68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Dick, Alexander, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/52] | Bieberbach, Andreas, Dr. BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX/G C 100 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03712028.4 | 17.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003EP02735 | Priority number, date | DE20021012892 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212892 | [2004/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03078629 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1487979 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1487979 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1487979 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/82 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/8218 (EP,US);
C12N15/8247 (EP,US);
C12N15/825 (EP,US);
C12N15/8251 (EP,US);
C12N15/8269 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/51] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGULATION DER GENEXPRESSION | [2004/52] | English: | CONSTRUCTS AND METHODS FOR THE REGULATION OF GENE EXPRESSION | [2004/52] | French: | PRODUIT DE SYNTHESE ET PROCEDE DE REGULATION DE L'EXPRESSION GENIQUE | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 12.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.12.2008 | 10.12.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2010
11.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE Bayer CropScience NV/Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation J.E. Mommaertslaan 14/Black Mountain Science and Innovation Park Clunies Ross Street 1831 Diegem/BE/Acton ACT 2601/ AU / BE Opponent's representative Almond-Martin, Carol, et al, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges 69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2016/35] |
Former [2012/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2010
11.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE Bayer CropScience NV J.E. Mommaertslaan 14 1831 Diegem / BE Opponent's representative Almond-Martin, Carol, et al, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges 69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2010/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2010
Bayer BioScience N.V. Technologiepark 38 9052 Gent / BE Opponent's representative Almond-Martin, Carol, et al, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges 69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | 30.06.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.01.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.03.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.03.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.11.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.08.2012 | Appeal received No. T1772/12 | 08.10.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.12.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 08.08.2012 | Appeal received No. T1772/12 | 05.10.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.12.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 16.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IE | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | AT | 17.03.2010 | LU | 17.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/14] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 26.08.2009 | |
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 26.08.2009 | |
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 26.08.2009 | |
SE | 26.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9323551 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-17 * Ansprüche,;; examples 1-8 *; | [A]WO0200894 (CROPDESIGN NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [YD] - FIRE A ET AL, "Potent and specific genetic interference by double-stranded RNA in Caenorhabditis elegans", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19980219), vol. 391, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 806 - 811, XP002095876 [YD] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35888 | [A] - FIRE A, "RNA-triggered gene silencing", TRENDS IN GENETICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990901), vol. 15, no. 9, ISSN 0168-9525, pages 358 - 363, XP004176656 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9525(99)01818-1 | [A] - MONTGOMERY ET AL, "RNA as a target of double-stranded RNA-mediated genetic interference in Caenorhabditis elegans", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199812), vol. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 15502 - 15507, XP002138441 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.26.15502 | [A] - WESLEY S VARSHA ET AL, "Construct design for efficient, effective and high-throughput gene silencing in plants", PLANT JOURNAL, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (200109), vol. 27, no. 6, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 581 - 590, XP002187670 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.2001.01105.x | Examination | WO03076620 | by applicant | EP0067553 | US4407956 | WO8402913 | EP0116718 | EP0120516 | EP0140308 | WO8501856 | US4536475 | US4684611 | EP0270356 | EP0291533 | WO8903887 | EP0321201 | WO8910396 | EP0335528 | EP0360257 | EP0375091 | EP0388186 | US4962028 | US4987071 | EP0409625 | WO9105865 | WO9113991 | WO9113980 | WO9116440 | WO9116426 | EP0458367 | EP0465572 | WO9204456 | US5116742 | WO9211375 | WO9211376 | WO9216635 | WO9217596 | WO9218625 | US5187267 | WO9303161 | WO9305159 | WO9305160 | WO9307275 | WO9310251 | WO9321334 | WO9323551 | WO9403607 | EP0591530 | WO9417194 | WO9418337 | WO9421794 | US5352605 | EP0620281 | US5365016 | WO9429465 | WO9507355 | WO9507993 | WO9515389 | US5428148 | WO9519443 | WO9523230 | WO9534668 | US5504200 | WO9612814 | US5530192 | US5593874 | US5597718 | WO9705900 | US5608152 | WO9713865 | WO9716559 | WO9732016 | US5683439 | US5689049 | US5689051 | US5698425 | WO9747731 | WO9801572 | US5712135 | WO9822593 | WO9826064 | US5789214 | WO9836083 | US5804693 | WO9845461 | WO9845456 | WO9915682 | WO9916890 | WO9932619 | WO9953050 | WO0026388 | - VAN DER KROL AR ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 658 - 676 | - DE LANGE P ET AL., CURR TOP MICROBIOL IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 197, pages 57 - 75 | - MONTGOMERY MK ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 15502 - 15507 | - SHARP PA, GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (1999), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 139 - 141 | - FIRE A ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 806 - 11 | - GOA J, SCAND J CLIN LAB INVEST, (1953), vol. 5, pages 218 - 222 | - LOWRY OH ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1951), vol. 193, pages 265 - 275 | - BRADFORD MM, ANALYT BIOCHEM, (1976), vol. 72, pages 248 - 254 | - SAMBROOK J; FRITSCH EF; MANIATIS T ET AL., Molecular Cloning (A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), pages 9.31 - 9.57 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY &SONS, (1989), pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6 | - MCCULLOUGH AJ; SCHULER MA, NUC ACIDS RES, (1997), vol. 25, pages 1071 - 1077 | - ZUKER; STIEGLER, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1981), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 133 - 48 | - TANNER NK, FEMS MICROBIOL REV, (1999), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 257 - 275 | - HASELOFF ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, pages 585 - 591 | - HASELHOFF; GERLACH, NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, pages 585 - 591 | - STEINECKE P ET AL., EMBO J, (1992), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 1525 - 1530 | - DE FEYTER R ET AL., MOL GEN GENET., (1996), vol. 250, no. 3, pages 329 - 338 | - STEINECKE P ET AL., Ribozymes, Methods in Cell Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC, (1995), vol. 50, pages 449 - 460 | - BAYLEY CC ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL., (1992), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 353 - 361 | - LLOYD AM; DAVIS RW ET AL., MOL GEN GENET., (1994), vol. 242, no. 6, pages 653 - 657 | - BARTEL D; SZOSTAK JW, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, pages 1411 - 1418 | - NAGEL R; ARES M, RNA, (2000), vol. 6, pages 1142 - 1156 | - MERITT ET AL., PLANT JOURNAL, (1997), vol. 12, pages 937 - 943 | - EGOAVIL ET AL., PLANT JOURNAL, (1997), vol. 12, pages 971 - 980 | - SAUER B, METHODS, (1998), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 381 - 92 | - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, vol. 185, pages 527 - 537 | - BILANG, GENE, (1991), vol. 100, pages 247 - 250 | - SCHEID ET AL., MOL GEN GENET, (1991), vol. 228, pages 104 - 112 | - GUERCHE ET AL., PLANT SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 52, pages 111 - 116 | - NEUHAUSE ET AL., THEOR APPL GENET, (1987), vol. 75, pages 30 - 36 | - KLEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 327, pages 70 - 73 | - HOWELL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1980), vol. 208, page 1265 | - HORSCH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 227, pages 1229 - 1231 | - DEBLOCK ET AL., Plant Physiology, (1989), vol. 91, pages 694 - 701 | - SHURE M ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 35, pages 225 - 233 | - PREISS ET AL., Tailoring Genes for Crop Improvement, PLENUM PRESS, (1987), pages 133 - 152 | - GUPTA ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL., (1988), vol. 10, pages 215 - 224 | - OLIVE ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1989), vol. 12, pages 525 - 538 | - BHATTACHARYYA ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 60, pages 155 - 122 | - DUNWELL JM, J EXP BOTANY, (2000), vol. 51, pages 487 - 96 | - BRAR DS ET AL., BIOTECH GENET ENG REV, (1996), vol. 13, pages 167 - 79 | - KISHORE GM; SOMERVILLE CR, CURR OPIN BIOTECH, (1993), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 152 - 8 | - KOHNO-MURASE J ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1994), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 1115 - 1124 | - CORREIA JJ, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (2000), vol. 321, pages 81 - 100 | - ZEH M ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL, (2001), vol. 127, no. 3, pages 792 - 802 | - DUNWELL JM, "Transgenic approaches to crop improvement", J EXP BOT., (2000), vol. 51, doi:doi:10.1093/jexbot/51.suppl_1.487, pages 487 - 96, XP002350350 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jexbot/51.suppl_1.487 | - BENFEY ET AL., EMBO J, (1989), vol. 8, pages 2195 - 2202 | - FRANCK ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 21, pages 285 - 294 | - ODELL ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 810 - 812 | - SHEWMAKER ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1985), vol. 140, pages 281 - 288 | - GARDNER ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1986), vol. 6, pages 221 - 228 | - HOLTORF S ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1995), vol. 29, pages 637 - 649 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOI, (1992), vol. 18, pages 675 - 689 | - BRUCE ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SEI USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 9692 - 9696 | - BUSTOS MM ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, no. 9, pages 839 - 53 | - JOSEFFSON LG ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1987), vol. 262, pages 12196 - 12201 | - SHIRSAT A ET AL., MOL GEN GENET, (1989), vol. 215, no. 2, pages 326 - 331 | - BÄUMLEIN H ET AL., MOL GEN GENET, (1991), vol. 225, no. 3, pages 459 - 67 | - STALBERG K ET AL., L PLANTA, (1996), vol. 199, pages 515 - 519 | - BÄUMLEIN H ET AL., MOL GEN GENET, (1991), vol. 225, pages 121 - 128 | - BAEUMLEIN ET AL., PLANT JOURNAL, (1992), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 233 - 9 | - FIEDLER U ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY (NY, (1995), vol. 13, no. 10, page 1090F | - STOCKHAUS ET AL., EMBO J, (1989), vol. 8, pages 2445 - 2451 | - GATZ ET AL., ANNU REV PLANT PHYSIOL PLANT MOL BIOL, (1997), vol. 48, pages 89 - 108 | - WARD ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1993), vol. 22, pages 361 - 366 | - GATZ ET AL., PLANT J, (1992), vol. 2, pages 397 - 404 | - REDOLFI ET AL., NETH J PLANT PATHOL, (1983), vol. 89, pages 245 - 254 | - UKNES ET AL., THE PLANT CELL, (1992), vol. 4, pages 645 - 656 | - VAN LOON, PLANT MOL VIRAL, (1985), vol. 4, pages 111 - 116 | - MARINEAU ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1987), vol. 9, pages 335 - 342 | - MATTON ET AL., MOLECULAR PLANT-MICROBE INTERACTIONS, (1987), vol. 2, pages 325 - 342 | - SOMSSICH ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SEI USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 2427 - 2430 | - SOMSSICH ET AL., MOL GEN GENETICS, (1988), vol. 2, pages 93 - 98 | - CHEN ET AL., PLANT J, (1996), vol. 10, pages 955 - 966 | - ZHANG; SING, PROC NATL ACAD SEI USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 2507 - 2511 | - WARNER ET AL., PLANT J, (1993), vol. 3, pages 191 - 201 | - SIEBERTZ ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 961 - 968 | - RYAN, ANN REV PHYTOPATH, (1990), vol. 28, pages 425 - 449 | - DUAN ET AL., NAT BIOTECH, (1996), vol. 14, pages 494 - 498 | - STANFORD ET AL., MOL GEN GENET, (1989), vol. 215, pages 200 - 208 | - MCGURL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 225, pages 1570 - 1573 | - ROHMEIER ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1993), vol. 22, pages 783 - 792 | - ECKELKAMP ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1993), vol. 323, pages 73 - 76 | - CORDEROK ET AL., THE PLANT J, (1994), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 141 - 150 | - LAM E; CHUA NH, J BIOL CHEM, (1991), vol. 266, no. 26, pages 17131 - 17135 | - SCHOFFL F ET AL., MOLECULAR & GENERAL GENETICS, (1989), vol. 217, no. 2-3, pages 246 - 53 | - GALLIE ET AL., NUCL ACIDS RES, (1987), vol. 15, pages 8693 - 8711 | - ROUSTER J ET AL., PLANT J, (1998), vol. 15, pages 435 - 440 | - GIELEN ET AL., EMBO J, (1984), vol. 3, page 835 FF | - SCHENBORN E; GROSKREUTZ D, MOL BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 29 - 44 | - SHEEN ET AL., PLANT JOURNAL, (1995), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 777 - 784 | - OW ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 234, pages 856 - 859 | - PRASHER ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1985), vol. 126, no. 3, pages 1259 - 1268 | - JEFFERSON ET AL., EMBO J, (1987), vol. 6, pages 3901 - 3907 | - MCCORMICK ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1986), vol. 5, pages 81 - 84 | - Plant Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, CRC PRESS, (1993), pages 71 - 119 | - "Techniques for Gene Transfer", JENES B ET AL., Transgenic Plants, Bd. 1, Engineering and Utilization, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), vol. 1, pages 128 - 143 | - POTRYKUS, ANNU REV PLANT PHYSIOL PLANT MOLEC BIOL, (1991), vol. 42, pages 205 - 225 | - HALFORD NG; SHEWRY PR, BR MED BULL, (2000), vol. 56, no. 1, pages 62 - 73 | - FROMM ME ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 833 - 9 | - GORDON-KAMM ET AL., THE PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, page 603 | - HORSCH RB ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 225, page 1229F | - HOLSTERS ET AL., MOL GEN GENET, (1978), vol. 163, pages 181 - 187 | - HOEKEMA, The Binary Plant Vector System | - AN ET AL., EMBO J, (1985), vol. 4, pages 277 - 287 | - "Vectors for Gene Transfer in Higher Plants", WHITE FF, Transgenic Plants, Vol. 1, Engineering and Utilization, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), pages 15 - 38 | - "Techniques for Gene Transfer", JENES B ET AL., Transgenic Plants, Vol. 1, Engineering and Utilization, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), pages 128 - 143 | - RATHORE KS ET AL., PLANT MOL BIOL, (1993), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 871 - 884 | - FENNELL ET AL., PLANT CELL REP., (1992), vol. 11, pages 567 - 570 | - STOEGER ET AL., PLANT CELL REP., (1995), vol. 14, pages 273 - 278 | - JAHNE ET AL., THEOR APPL GENET, (1994), vol. 89, pages 525 - 533 | - FALCIATORE ET AL., MARINE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 239 - 251 | - DUNAHAY ET AL., J PHYCOL, (1995), vol. 31, pages 10004 - 1012 |