EP1493103 - AN ADAPTIVE WEB BROWSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUSTONEN, Mika, P. Alarannantie 261 C FIN-91100 Ii / FI | 02 /
RYTIVAARA, Markku Koivukuja 7 FIN-90230 Oulu / FI | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2019/30] |
Former [2010/17] | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2009/42] | Määttä, Jukka Tapani, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2009/39] | Svensson, Johan Henrik, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2008/43] | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2005/01] | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo Berggren Oy Ab Lentokatu 2 90460 Oulunsalo / FI | Application number, filing date | 03712163.9 | 21.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003FI00220 | Priority number, date | FI20020000664 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: FI 20020664 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03085553 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493103 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493103 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/957 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
G06F16/957 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ADAPTIVER WEB-BROWSER | [2005/01] | English: | AN ADAPTIVE WEB BROWSER | [2005/01] | French: | NAVIGATEUR WEB ADAPTATIF | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 22.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 27.09.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 07.12.2012 | Appeal received No. T0505/13 | 31.01.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.06.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 06.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.06.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP18175621.4 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 03.07.2018 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2005 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2003 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | IE | 21.03.2020 | LU | 21.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IE | 21.03.2020 | ||
LU | 21.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IE | 21.03.2020 | ||
LU | 21.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA] - HENRICKSEN K ET AL, "Adapting the Web interface: an adaptive Web browser", PROCEEDINGS SECOND AUSTRALASIAN USER INTERFACE CONFERENCE. AUIC 2001, PROCEEDINGS SECOND AUSTRALASIAN USER INTERFACE CONFERENCE. AUIC 2001, GOLD COAST, QLD., AUSTRALIA, 29 JAN.-1 FEB. 2001, 2001, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc, USA, ISBN 0-7695-0969-X, pages 21 - 28, XP002241327 [X] 14 * CHAPTER 2.3; page 22 * [A] 1-13,15,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AUIC.2001.906272 | [A] - "Tips for faster websurfing", GOOD BOOKS ON USABILITY, (20010927), URL: http://www.fjordaan.uklinux.net/moveabletype/fblog/archives/000061.html, (20030515), XP002241328 [A] 1-16 * page 1 * |