EP1487897 - POLYMERISATION METHOD, POLYMERS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRANFIELD UNIVERSITY Silsoe Milton Keynes Bedfordshire MK45 4DT / GB | [2006/04] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Cranfield University Silsoe Milton Keynes, Bedfordshire MK45 4DT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PILETSKY, Sergey Anatoliyovich 8 Harter Avenue Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK43 0EE / GB | 02 /
PILETSKA, Olena Volodimirivna 8 Harter Avenue Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK43 0EE / GB | 03 /
TURNER, Anthony Peter Francis "Elmsfields", 8 Brook End North Crawley, Buckinghamshire MK16 9HH / GB | 04 /
KARIM, Khalku 12 Gurney Way Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 2ED / GB | 05 /
CHEN, Beining Department of Chemistry, University of Sheffield Sheffield, Yorkshire S3 7HF / GB | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2004/52] | Stuart, Ian Alexander, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03712406.2 | 24.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003GB01263 | Priority number, date | GB20020006944 | 23.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0206944 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080698 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1487897 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1487897 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/12 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
C08G61/02 (EP,US);
C08G61/12 (EP,US);
C08G61/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN, POLYMERE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2004/52] | English: | POLYMERISATION METHOD, POLYMERS AND USES THEREOF | [2004/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION, POLYMERES ET UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERS | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2006 | BE | 25.01.2006 | CH | 25.01.2006 | CY | 25.01.2006 | CZ | 25.01.2006 | EE | 25.01.2006 | FI | 25.01.2006 | LI | 25.01.2006 | NL | 25.01.2006 | RO | 25.01.2006 | SI | 25.01.2006 | SK | 25.01.2006 | TR | 25.01.2006 | IE | 24.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | BG | 25.04.2006 | DK | 25.04.2006 | GR | 26.04.2006 | PT | 26.06.2006 | HU | 26.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2006 | ||
EE | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
TR | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 24.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
HU | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2006 | ||
EE | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 24.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
HU | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2006 | ||
EE | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 24.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 24.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
GR | 26.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 24.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
RO | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 24.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
IT | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 24.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
BE | 25.01.2006 | ||
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
IE | 24.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
SK | 25.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
DK | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
SI | 25.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 25.04.2006 | ||
PT | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
NL | 25.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 25.01.2006 | |
CH | 25.01.2006 | ||
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 25.01.2006 | |
FI | 25.01.2006 | ||
LI | 25.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 25.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH03134018 ; | [A]JPH05255486 ; | [X]US5185385 (KANLUEN RATANA [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 10; example -; claim - *; | [A]US5248734 (OBER CHRISTOPHER K [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * claim - *; | [A]EP0585195 (THREE BOND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4 * claim - *; | [A]US2002022689 (MENON VINOD P [US], et al) [A] 1,4* claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910829), vol. 015, no. 341, Database accession no. (C - 0863), & JP03134018 A 19910607 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND LTD) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940113), vol. 018, no. 019, Database accession no. (C - 1152), & JP05255486 A 19931005 (UNITIKA LTD) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |