EP1496909 - COMBINATION THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [2005/03] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
PT
RO
SE
SK
TR
AstraZeneca AB S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYAN, Anderson, Joseph AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [2005/03] | Application number, filing date | 03712464.1 | 14.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003GB01617 | Priority number, date | GB20020008680 | 16.04.2002 Original published format: GB 0208680 | GB20020018388 | 08.08.2002 Original published format: GB 0218388 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088971 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496909 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496909 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/517, A61K31/165, A61P35/00 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/517 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/661 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 16.11.2004 | LV | 16.11.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2005/03] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2005/03] | French: | THERAPIE COMBINEE DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2007 | BE | 14.02.2007 | CY | 14.02.2007 | CZ | 14.02.2007 | DK | 14.02.2007 | EE | 14.02.2007 | FI | 14.02.2007 | NL | 14.02.2007 | RO | 14.02.2007 | SI | 14.02.2007 | SK | 14.02.2007 | TR | 14.02.2007 | LU | 14.04.2007 | IE | 16.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | BG | 15.05.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | PT | 16.07.2007 | HU | 15.08.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
LU | 14.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
EE | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
RO | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
SK | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
FI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
SI | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | FI | 14.02.2007 | |
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
BG | 15.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9633980 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-12* claims 1-19 *; | [AD]WO9902166 (ANGIOGENE PHARM LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 17, line 12 *; | [A] - CIARDIELLO F ET AL, "A novel approach in the treatment of cancer: targeting the epidermal growth factor receptor.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH: AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. UNITED STATES OCT 2001, (200110), vol. 7, no. 10, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 2958 - 2970, XP002248479 [A] 1-12 * page 2963 - page 2964 * |