EP1504816 - TITANIUM OXIDE PHOTOCATALYST, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSAKA Titanium Technologies Co., Ltd. 1, Higashihama-cho Amagasaki Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | For:DE
FR
GB
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states OSAKA Titanium technologies Co., Ltd. 1, Higashihama-cho Amagasaki Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | |||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Sumitomo Titanium Corporation 1, Higashihamacho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | ||
For:DE
GB
FR
SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Katsumi, SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 02 /
NISHIHARA, Katsuhiro, SUMITOMO METAL IND., LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 03 /
MASAKI, Yasuhiro, SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 04 /
KAJIMURA, Haruhiko, SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Michiyasu, SUMITOMO METAL IND., LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 06 /
YAO, Tadashi, SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 07 /
OGASAWARA, Tadashi, SUMITOMO TITANIUM CORPORATION 1, Higashihamacho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | 08 /
WATANABE, Munetoshi, c/o SUMITOMO TITANIUM CORP. 1, Higashihamacho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | 09 /
SHIMOSAKI, Shinji, SUMITOMO TITANIUM CORPORATION 1, Higashihamacho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | 10 /
ODA, Kouji, SUMITOMO TITANIUM CORPORATION 1, Higashihamacho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | 11 /
NAGAOKA, Sadanobu, SUMITOMO TITANIUM CORPORATION 1, Higashihamacho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 660-8533 / JP | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Collin, Jérôme, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Collin, Jérôme, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2005/06] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03712786.7 | 20.03.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003JP03401 | Priority number, date | JP20020083222 | 25.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002083222 | JP20020321101 | 05.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002321101 | JP20030012492 | 21.01.2003 Original published format: JP 200312492 | [2005/36] |
Former [2005/06] | JP20020083222 | 25.03.2002 | |
JP20020321101 | 05.11.2002 | ||
JP20030124092 | 21.01.2003 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080244 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504816 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/02, B01J27/135, B01J27/10, B01J27/128, B01J27/132, B01J37/02, B01J37/08 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
B01J35/39 (EP,US);
B01J27/10 (KR);
B01D53/8609 (EP,US);
B01D53/8612 (EP,US);
B01D53/8628 (EP,US);
B01D53/8634 (EP,US);
B01D53/8662 (EP,US);
B01J35/00 (KR);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J37/0238 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (KR);
B01J37/22 (EP,US);
B01D2255/802 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J23/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TITANOXID-PHOTOKATALYSATOR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ANWENDUNG | [2005/06] | English: | TITANIUM OXIDE PHOTOCATALYST, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND APPLICATION | [2005/06] | French: | PHOTOCATALYSEUR OXYDE DE TITANE, PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE CE PHOTOCATALYSEUR ET APPLICATION | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2004 | Translation filed | 04.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 26.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0110553 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP], et al); | [X]WO0110552 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP], et al); | [X]WO0156928 (ECODEVICE LAB CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XP]EP1205245 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]); | [XP]EP1205244 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]); | [XP]EP1254863 (ECODEVICE LAB CO LTD [JP]); | International search | [Y]JPH07275704 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA); | [Y]JPH10113563 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [X]EP1066878 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO0156928 (ECODEVICE LAB CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XP]JP2002239395 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA) |