EP1501072 - REPRESENTATION GENERATION METHOD, REPRESENTATION GENERATION DEVICE, AND REPRESENTATION GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sano, Yoshihiko 2014-176, Akitsu Tojyo-cho, Kato-gun, Hyogo 673-1302 / JP | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03712790.9 | 20.03.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003JP03407 | Priority number, date | JP20020084623 | 25.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002084623 | [2005/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03081572 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1501072 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00, G10K15/02, H04M1/725, G06T11/80 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
H04M19/041 (EP,US);
G10H1/0025 (EP,US);
H04M1/56 (EP,US);
H04M1/575 (EP,US);
H04M1/576 (EP,US);
H04M1/578 (EP,US);
G10H2230/021 (EP,US);
G10H2240/251 (EP,US);
G10H2240/305 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REPRÄSENTATIONSERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN, REPRÄSENTATIONSERZEUGUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND REPRÄSENTATIONSERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM | [2005/04] | English: | REPRESENTATION GENERATION METHOD, REPRESENTATION GENERATION DEVICE, AND REPRESENTATION GENERATION SYSTEM | [2005/04] | French: | PROCEDE, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTEME DE GENERATION DE REPRESENTATION | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2003 | Translation filed | 21.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/19] | Request for further processing for: | 06.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.04.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10233822 ; | [X]GB2268663 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * pages 2-3 *; | [X]WO9627974 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * line 8 - page 10, line 22 * * page 15, line 19 - line 30 *; | [A]US5805677 (FERRY THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-6,9-12 * abstract * * column 9, line 62 - column 10, line 40 * * column 16, lines 10-35 *; | [X]GB2343586 (NEC TECHNOLOGIES [GB]) [X] 1-6,9-12 * abstract * * pages 2,4 *; | [X]JP2000197125 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | US6573825 [ ] (OKANO YOICHI [JP]) [ ] * column 1, line 49 - line 65 ** column 3, line 20 - line 47 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10233822 A 19980902 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [X] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH05219151 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH07152313 (YAMAHA CORP); | [A]JPH1173186 (ALPHA BETEITSUKU AKUSHIYON KK); | [X]JPH11203456 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]JP2000295374 (DAIICHIKOSHO CO LTD); | [X]JP2001045105 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [Y]JP2001265337 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [X]JP2001318677 (MEGA CHIPS CORP); | [Y]JP2002023607 (YAMAHA CORP); | [Y]JP2002073044 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [XP]JP2002162967 (SONY CORP); | [XP]JP2002162968 (ZONE KK M, et al); | [XP]JP2003044046 (SONY CORP) |