EP1484968 - CHITOSAN-CONTAINING COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING DISEASE RESISTANCE AND GROWTH OF PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKURAI, Haseo, c/o Showa Denko K. K. 5-1 Oogimachi, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0867 / JP | 02 /
FUKUYA, Hiroki, c/o Showa Denko K. K. 111 Nagayachi, Higashinagahara, Kawahigashi-machi Kawanuma-gun, Fukushima 969-3431 / JP | 03 /
ANZAI, Fukumi, c/o Showa Denko K. K. 111 Nagayachi, Higashinagahara, Kawahigashi-machi Kawanuma-gun, Fukushima 969-3431 / JP | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2004/51] | Application number, filing date | 03712813.9 | 20.03.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003JP03472 | Priority number, date | JP20020077965 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002077965 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03077654 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484968 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/16 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A01N43/16 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/30 (KR);
A01N37/04 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/16, A01N43/16, A01N25/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | 05.10.2004 | LT | 05.10.2004 | LV | 05.10.2004 | MK | 05.10.2004 | Title | German: | CHITOSANHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE VERBESSERUNG DER KRANKHEITSRESISTENZ UND DES WACHSTUMS VON PFLANZEN | [2004/51] | English: | CHITOSAN-CONTAINING COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING DISEASE RESISTANCE AND GROWTH OF PLANTS | [2004/51] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DU CHITOSANE AMELIORANT LA RESISTANCE AUX MALADIES ET LA CROISSANCE DE PLANTES | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 12.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9709879 (BIOESTIMULANTES ORGANICOS LDA [PT]) [X] 1-23 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 8 * * page 8, paragraph 3; claims 1,3 *; | [X]WO9834464 (DCV INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,20-23 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 13 * * page 7, line 18 - line 22 * * page 8, line 4 - line 7 *; | [X]WO0059949 (BEN SHALOM NOACH [IL], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 5, line 16 - line 22 * * page 17, line 14 - page 18, line 2 * * page 19, line 8 - line 9 * * examples 10,15-23; claims 3,5,6,8 *; | [A]US6167652 (HEINSOHN GEORGE E [US], et al) [A] 1-23* abstract *; | [A]WO0119187 (INST WLOKIEN CHEM [PL], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * |