EP1489590 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industries Co. Ltd. 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAMOTO, Yasuhiro 28-13-102, Ikedanakamachi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0074 / JP | 02 /
FUNAMOTO, Taro 5-3-D-102, Onoharahigashi Mino-shi, Osaka 562-0031 / JP | 03 /
ARIMOTO, Katsuyuki 2-2033-9, Tsudakadai Okayama-shi, Okayama 701-1151 / JP | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr. Patentanwalt, Nägelsbachstrasse 49a 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03712889.9 | 25.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003JP03577 | Priority number, date | JP20020091870 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002091870 | [2004/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03083820 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1489590 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G02F1/133 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
G09G3/3648 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G3/3406 (EP,US);
G09G3/36 (KR);
G09G2310/061 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0606 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0626 (EP,US);
G09G2320/064 (EP,US);
G09G3/2018 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG | [2004/52] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2004/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2004 | Translation filed | 25.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5844540 (TERASAKI HIROHIDE [JP]) [A] 1-7,18,19 * column 1, lines 24-29 *; | [X]EP1014332 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-7,18,19 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]JP2001125547 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-7,18,19 * the whole document *; | US6693619 [ ] (MIURA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [ ] * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, lines 44-65 * * column 3, lines 24-43 ** column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 5; figures 3-5 * | International search | [A]JP2000293142 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2000321551 (SHARP KK); | [XP]JP2003050569 (HITACHI LTD, et al) |