EP1496067 - THERMOPLASTIC POLYMER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Hideki 305 Sankutasu Yagoto, 1-119 Omoteyama, Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 468-0069 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Akiko 201 Koki No.8, 2-30-2 Doichi-cho, Miizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-0843 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Daisuke H202 Toray Narumi-syataku, 1-82 Ikegamidai Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0044 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Daisuke D-3-4 Toray Narumi-syataku, 1-81 Ikegamidai Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0044 / JP | 05 /
YAMANAKA, Toru 914 Naruoka 3-chome, Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0005 / JP | [2005/14] |
Former [2005/02] | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Hideki 305 Sankutasu Yagoto, 1-119 Omoteyama, Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 468-0069 / JP | ||
02 /
TANAKA, Akiko 201 Koki No.8, 2-30-2 Doichi-cho, Miizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-0843 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMANOTO, Daisuke H202 Toray Narumi-syataku, 1-82 Ikegamidai Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0044 / JP | |||
04 /
SATO, Daisuke D-3-4 Toray Narumi-syataku, 1-81 Ikegamidai Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0044 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMANAKA, Toru 914 Naruoka 3-chome, Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 458-0005 / JP | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2005/02] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03712911.1 | 25.03.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003JP03608 | Priority number, date | JP20020085345 | 26.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002085345 | JP20020160806 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002160806 | JP20020172183 | 13.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002172183 | [2005/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080683 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496067 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1496067 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/48, G02B1/04 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
G02B1/041 (EP,US);
C08F8/48 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
G02B1/04 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/48, C08F220/14 (US,EP);
G02B1/041, C08L33/00 (US,EP);
G02B1/04, C08L101/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHES POLYMER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND FORMKÖRPER | [2005/02] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC POLYMER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND MOLDED ARTICLE | [2005/02] | French: | POLYMERE THERMOPLASTIQUE, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE, ET ARTICLE MOULE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2004 | Translation filed | 19.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 05.04.2007 | Observations by third parties | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/10] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60136791 ; | [X]JPS6020905 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 1-3,6-8,13,14 * examples 2,6; table 1 *; | [A]EP0264508 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP0273397 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2002060424 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [X] 1-6,13-15 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO02085980 (PLASKOLITE INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,6-8,13,14 * example 1; claims 13,14 * * table 1, experiments 6 and 7 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * example 7; table 3 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 35, Database accession no. 1985-213800, XP002428720 & JPS60136791 A 19850720 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4874824 (HALLDEN-ABBERTON MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [X]JPH05105797 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH08301931 (KURARAY CO); | [XE]JP2002284816 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [XE]JP2002293835 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [XP]JP2003155309 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | Examination | JPS6241973B | JP2000239325 | WO0129138 | other | JP2002060424K | JP2000239325K | JPS6241973K | JPS6241973B | JP2000239325 | WO0129138 | - "Test for thermal stability (incl. EN transl.)", Illustrated dictionary of plastics terms, 2nd ed., NIKKAN KOGYOU SHINBUNSA, (199806), page 455, ISBN 4-526-03619-6, XP003008117 | - "incl. EN transl.", SOCIETY OF POLYMER SCIENCE, Polymer dictionary, 3rd ed., JAPAN, (200506), page 726, ISBN 4-254-25248-X, XP003008118 |