Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014282701 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93425304 | 03.09.2004 | US201414294624 | 03.06.2014 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009158363 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39042009 | 21.02.2009 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | US96395107 | 24.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009158356 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | US39041909 | 21.02.2009 | US96395107 | 24.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009158355 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | US96395107 | 24.12.2007 | US39041809 | 21.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009158335 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39042209 | 21.02.2009 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | US96395107 | 24.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009158334 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | US38977709 | 20.02.2009 | US96395107 | 24.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009158333 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | US38977409 | 20.02.2009 | US96395107 | 24.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009158319 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US39042109 | 21.02.2009 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | US96395107 | 24.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009158310 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93425304 | 03.09.2004 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | US37297909 | 18.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008104637 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | US96395107 | 24.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008098422 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96394507 | 24.12.2007 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008098421 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96394207 | 24.12.2007 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8745656 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2014 | B2 | US2005028190 | 03.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93425304 | 03.09.2004 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1486062 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2005 | A4 | EP1486062 | 15.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0303391 | 05.02.2003 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2475723 | 25.01.2011 | C | CA2475723 | 21.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0303391 | 05.02.2003 | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03069898 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7334251 | 19.02.2008 | B2 | US2003154475 | 14.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7384202 | 11.02.2002 |