EP1486062 - MANAGEMENT OF TELEVISION ADVERTISING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2015/47] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ, Arturo, A. 5315 Abigail Lane Norcross, GA 30092 / US | 02 /
WEST, John, Eric 3389 Ambleside Place Roswell, GA 30075 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/51] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03713364.2 | 05.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003US03391 | Priority number, date | US20020073842 | 11.02.2002 Original published format: US 73842 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03069898 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486062 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N7/173 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0241 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0242 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0257 (EP,US);
H04N21/433 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (US);
H04N21/4335 (EP,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/4667 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON FERNSEHWERBUNG | [2004/51] | English: | MANAGEMENT OF TELEVISION ADVERTISING | [2004/51] | French: | GESTION DE PUBLICITE TELEVISUELLE | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 17.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 25.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0680214 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [XA]WO9966719 (WEBTV NETWORKS INC [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-20; | [A]WO0049801 (INDEX SYSTEMS INC, et al) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 10 *; | [A]WO0124067 (DISCOUNTNET PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-20* abstract * | International search | [AP]US6463585 (HENDRICKS JOHN S [US], et al); | [YP]US6507949 (JONASON JOAKIM [SE], et al); | [XE]US6574793 (NGO J THOMAS [US], et al) | Examination | WO9952285 |