EP1483722 - MEMORY MODULE ASSEMBLY USING PARTIALLY DEFECTIVE CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celetronix International, Ltd Clarendon House, 2 Church street, Box HM666 Hamilton HM CX / BM | For all designated states Celetronix USA, Inc. 2125 B Madera Drive Simi Valey, CA 93065 / US | [2007/16] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Celetronix International, Ltd Clarendon House, 2 Church street, Box HM666 Hamilton HM CX / BM | ||
For all designated states Celetronix USA, Inc. 2125 B Madera Drive Simi Valey, CA 93065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDDLE, Charles, I. 2125B Madera Road Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03713706.4 | 24.02.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003US05845 | Priority number, date | US20020360036P | 26.02.2002 Original published format: US 360036 P | US20030371736 | 20.02.2003 Original published format: US 371736 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03073356 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483722 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483722 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G11C5/06 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
H01L22/20 (EP,US);
G11C7/00 (KR);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11C11/40 (KR);
G11C29/00 (KR);
G11C29/022 (EP,US);
G11C29/88 (EP,US);
G11C29/886 (EP,US);
G11C5/063 (EP,US);
H01L23/562 (EP,US);
H05K1/029 (EP,US);
H05K1/0292 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4899 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H05K1/181 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2004/50] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERMODULBAUGRUPPE, DIE TEILWEISE DEFEKTE CHIPS VERWENDET | [2004/50] | English: | MEMORY MODULE ASSEMBLY USING PARTIALLY DEFECTIVE CHIPS | [2004/50] | French: | ENSEMBLE MODULE DE MEMOIRE UTILISANT DES PUCES PARTIELLEMENT DEFECTUEUSES | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06115412.6 / EP1699056 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | CZ | 18.04.2007 | EE | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | LI | 18.04.2007 | SI | 18.04.2007 | SK | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | BG | 18.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | HU | 19.10.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
HU | 19.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 18.04.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5058063 (WADA YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]US5208178 (USAMI MITSUO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US5867448 (MANN ERIC N [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 10 - line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US6119049 (PEDDLE CHARLES I [US]) [DA] 1-14 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 5; figure 3 *; | [A]US2001050856 (MATSUZAKI YASUROU [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0018] - [0023]; figure 7 * | International search | [Y]US5208178 (USAMI MITSUO [JP]); | [A]US5761145 (ZAGAR PAUL S [US], et al); | [Y]US6119049 (PEDDLE CHARLES I [US]) |