EP1480898 - INTERFOLDED SHEET DISPENSER HAVING A STARTER SHEET PULL-OUT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMS, Craig, M. 340 West Parkridge Appleton, WI 54911 / US | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03713757.7 | 28.02.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003US06075 | Priority number, date | US20020092029 | 06.03.2002 Original published format: US 92029 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03076305 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480898 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480898 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/08, A47K10/42 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
B65D83/0805 (EP,US);
A47K10/42 (KR);
A47K10/421 (EP,US);
B65D83/0835 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3266 (EP,US);
A47K2010/428 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/38] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABEBEHÄLTER FÜR GEFALTETE BLÄTTER MIT AUSZUGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/49] | English: | INTERFOLDED SHEET DISPENSER HAVING A STARTER SHEET PULL-OUT SYSTEM | [2004/49] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE FEUILLES ENTREPLIEES JETABLES A SYSTEME D'EXTRACTION DE FEUILLE DE DEPART | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2007 | 21.09.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2269039 (RAY ROSS) [X] 1-5,9,10,12,13,16-18,23 * column 1 - column 3; figures 1-9 * [Y] 6,14,15,19; | [Y]US3868052 (ROCKEFELLER WINSTON G) [Y] 6,19 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 17; figures 15,16 *; | [Y]WO0061458 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 22 *; | [AD]US4574952 (MASUI TOSHIMUNE [JP]) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9617794 (SHIN SUK KYUN [KR]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * |