Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004182875 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80677804 | 23.03.2004 | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20040086415 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0306075 | 28.02.2003 | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003217793B | Global Dossier | 18.09.2008 | B2 | AU2003217793 | 22.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0306075 | 28.02.2003 | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1480898 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2008 | B1 | EP1480898 | 01.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0306075 | 28.02.2003 | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0307900 | 25.02.2014 | B1 | BR0307900 | 21.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0306075 | 28.02.2003 | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2477128 | 30.11.2010 | C | CA2477128 | 18.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0306075 | 28.02.2003 | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60323610D1 | 30.10.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0306075 | 28.02.2003 | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04008096 | 26.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0306075 | 28.02.2003 | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03076305 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI250114B | 01.03.2006 | B | TW200400147 | 01.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6715633 | 06.04.2004 | B2 | US2003168467 | 11.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9202902 | 06.03.2002 |