Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010022945 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57557309 | 08.10.2009 | US38579103 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7621907 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2009 | B2 | US2003176854 | 18.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38579103 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101191254B | Global Dossier | 16.10.2012 | B1 | KR20100108624 | 07.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101173497B | Global Dossier | 14.08.2012 | B1 | KR20110118729 | 31.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101127502B | Global Dossier | 23.03.2012 | B1 | KR20040091112 | 27.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005522241 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2522319 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2013 | A3 | EP2522319 | 14.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | EP03714115 | 11.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003218127B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2007 | B2 | AU2003218127 | 29.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1482914 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2015 | B1 | EP1482914 | 27.10.2010 | A4 | EP1482914 | 08.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR039000 | 02.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38579103 | 11.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0308482 | 22.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2478772 | 18.01.2011 | C | CA2478772 | 25.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1638743B | 07.11.2012 | B | CN1638743 | 13.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2540247T | 09.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04008903 | 26.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI350189B | 11.10.2011 | B | TW200417387 | 16.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US38579103 | 11.03.2003 | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI364301B | 21.05.2012 | B | TW200803939 | 16.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US38579103 | 11.03.2003 | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200406923 | 29.04.2006 | B | Priority number | Date | US0307661 | 11.03.2003 | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03077972 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2005 | A8 | WO03077972 | 24.12.2003 | A3 | WO03077972 | 25.09.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013063308 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5424828B | Global Dossier | 26.02.2014 | B2 | JP2010063904 | 25.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL205443B | 30.04.2010 | B1 | PL372323 | 11.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2322233 | 20.04.2008 | C2 | RU2004130286 | 10.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US36315002 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Divisional application | EP2522319 |