EP1482914 - IMPLANTABLE DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE FOR THE EYE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/50] | IMPLANTABLE DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM | ||
[2014/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2011/31] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bosch 69, P.O. Box 62 6331 Hünenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODSTROM, Theron, Robert 6201 South Freeway Dallas, TX 76134-2099 / US | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Best, Michael, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [2015/17] |
Former [2004/50] | Best, Michael, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03714115.7 | 11.03.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003US07661 | Priority number, date | US20020363150P | 11.03.2002 Original published format: US 363150 P | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03077972 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1482914 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482914 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61F9/00 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
A61F9/0017 (EP,US);
A61M31/00 (KR);
A61K9/0051 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/50] | A61K9/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜRS AUGE | [2014/37] | English: | IMPLANTABLE DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE FOR THE EYE | [2014/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE MEDICAMENT IMPLANTABLE POUR L'OEIL | [2014/37] |
Former [2004/50] | IMPLANTIERBARES ARZNEIMITTELABGABESYSTEM | ||
Former [2004/50] | IMPLANTABLE DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM | ||
Former [2004/50] | SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION DE MEDICAMENT IMPLANTABLE | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12179762.5 / EP2522319 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2003 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BE | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 11.03.2003 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.03.2003 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 22.04.2015 | |
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4135514 (ZAFFARONI ALEJANDRO, et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,14-20,24 * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 44; figures 2-4 *; | [X]US4186184 (ZAFFARONI ALEJANDRO [US]) [X] 1-5,8-10,14-21,24 * column 8, line 14 - line 49; figure - *; | [X]US4220153 (DRESBACK DAVID S [US]) [X] 1-5,8-11,14-21,24 * column 5, line 47 - line 51; figure - * * column 5, line 47 - line 51 ** column 6, line 44 - line 59 *; | [X]US4309996 (THEEUWES FELIX) [X] 1-24 * column 6, line 1 - line 2; figures 1, 2a, 2b * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 63 *; | [X]WO9711655 (CONTROL DELIVERY SYS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11,14-21,24 * page 9, line 12 - line 32; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US4601893 (CARDINAL JOHN R [US]); | [A]US5314471 (BRAUKER JAMES H [US], et al); | [A]US5582838 (RORK GERALD S [US], et al); | [A]US5798042 (CHU WEN-HWA [US], et al); | [A]US6107102 (FERRARI MAURO [US]) | by applicant | US4309996 | US5770076 | US5797898 | US5985328 | US6123861 | US6331313 |