EP1485095 - FLUORINATED 4-AZASTEROID DERIVATIVES AS ANDROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Schering Corporation 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEISSNER, Robert, S. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
PERKINS, James, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2004/51] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc., European Patent Department, Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03714228.8 | 07.03.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003US08277 | Priority number, date | US20020363822P | 13.03.2002 Original published format: US 363822 P | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03077919 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485095 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07J73/00, A61K31/473, A61K31/568, A61P19/00, A61P5/26 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/473 (EP,KR,US);
C07J73/00 (KR);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/26 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | C07J73/00, A61K31/568, A61P19/00, A61P5/26 | ||
Former IPC [2004/51] | A61K31/473, C07D221/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | LT | 13.10.2004 | LV | 13.10.2004 | Title | German: | FLUORIERTE 4-AZASTEROID-DERIVATE ALS ANDROGEN-REZEPTOR-MODULATOREN | [2004/51] | English: | FLUORINATED 4-AZASTEROID DERIVATIVES AS ANDROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS | [2004/51] | French: | DERIVES DE 4-AZASTEROIDE FLUORE EN TANT QUE MODULATEUR DE RECEPTEUR ANDROGENIQUE | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 17.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9507926 (GLAXO INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * pages 31-35; examples 22-29 * * pages 40-41; examples 34-50 *; | [Y]WO9825623 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 22-24,31-36 * claims 1-28 * * page 6, lines 22-32 ** pages 14-19 *; | [XY] - GUARNA A ET AL, "RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN STRUCTURE AND ACTIVITY OF 5ALPHA-REDUCTASE INHIBITORS", INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS SERIES, EXCERPTA MEDICA, AMSTERDAM, (19940101), vol. 1064, ISSN 0531-5131, pages 93 - 108, XP000872634 [X] 1-6,21,25-30 * page 100; figure 6; compound IV * [Y] 22-24,31-36 | International search | [X]US5187278 (KING ANTHONY O [US], et al); | [X] - BROOKS J.R. ET AL., "Reductase inhibitory and anti-androgenic activities of some 4-azasteroids in the rat", STEROIDS, (1986), vol. 47, pages 1 - 19, XP000611237 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0039-128X(86)90072-3 | [X] - RASMUSSON G.H. ET AL., "Azasteroids: structure-activity relationship for inhibition of 5-alpha-reductase and of androgen receptor binding", J. MED. CHEM., (1986), vol. 29, pages 2298 - 2315, XP000568779 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00161a028 | Examination | - HIIPAKKA R. A. ET AL, "Molecular Mechanism of Androgen Action", TRENDS IN ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (19981001), vol. 9, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S1043-2760(98)00081-2, ISSN 1043-2760, pages 317 - 324 |