|
18.06.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.07.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Refund of fees (PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.04.2004 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |