15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
03.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
09.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
20.06.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
11.10.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
12.07.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.01.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.09.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
30.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.04.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
23.05.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.11.2007 |
First examination report |
|
27.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2006 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] |
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
19.08.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] |
15.07.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
15.04.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
15.04.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
22.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|