EP1534966 - SELF-ATTACHING FEMALE FASTENER ELEMENT, SEALED FASTENER AND PANEL ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF FORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whitesell International Corporation 5331 Dixie Highway Waterford, MI 48329 / US | [2013/46] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Whitesell International Corporation 22100 Trolley Industrial Drive Taylor, MI 48180 / US | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Fabristeel Products, Inc. 22100 Trolley Industrial Drive Taylor, MI 48180 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOJCIECHOWSKI, Stanley, E. 48693 Golden Oaks U:S Shelby Township MI 48317-2613 / US | 02 /
PARKER, John, M. 2216 Independence Boulevard Ann Arbor, MI 48104-6441 / US | [2006/19] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
WOJCIECHOWSKI, Stanley, E. 1342 Jenner Street Lancaster, CA 93534 / US | ||
02 /
PARKER, John, M. 2216 Independence Boulevard Ann Arbor, MI 48104-6441 / US | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2013/33] |
Former [2010/28] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/22] | Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03714262.7 | 20.03.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003US08424 | Priority number, date | US20020234692 | 04.09.2002 Original published format: US 234692 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022987 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534966 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1534966 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/06, F16B33/00, F01M11/04 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
F16B37/065 (EP,US);
F16B33/004 (EP,US);
F16B37/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Title | German: | SELBST-BEFESTIGUNG MUTTERELEMENT-BEFESTIGER, DICHTEN BEFESTIGUNG UND PLATTENZUSAMMENBAU UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBAU DESSELBEN | [2005/22] | English: | SELF-ATTACHING FEMALE FASTENER ELEMENT, SEALED FASTENER AND PANEL ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF FORMING SAME | [2005/22] | French: | FIXATION FEMELLE AUTOBLOQUANTE, FIXATION ETANCHE ET ASSEMBLAGE DE PANNEAUX ET SON PROCEDE DE FORMATIO | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2003 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | IE | 20.03.2014 | LU | 20.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.03.2003 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.03.2014 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 16.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0864766 (PROFIL VERBINDUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 9,10 * claims 15,16 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0561715 (FORMER [FR]) [A] 1,5,11 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 26 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2001010789 (PAMER W RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1,5,11 * page 5, paragraph 57 - paragraph 58 * * figures 7-9 * |