EP1522201 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF OVER-THE-AIR ACTIVATION AND MODIFICATION OF A MOBILE PHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Change - Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellfish Media, LLC 1633 Broadway, 20th Floor New York, NY 10019 / US | [2010/12] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states 3Guppies, Inc. 2001 Western Avenue, Suite 410 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | ||
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Mobile Operandi Communications Corp. 301-1008 Homer Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 2X1 / CA | ||
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Mobile Operandi Communications Corp. 301-1110 Hamilton Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 2S2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAYNE, Patrick 202, 1040 Hamilton Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 2R9 / CA | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 03714583.6 | 16.04.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003CA00565 | Priority number, date | US20020372731P | 16.04.2002 Original published format: US 372731 P | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090492 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522201 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32, G06F17/60 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
G06F16/972 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04W8/245 (EP,US);
H04W8/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/15] | Extension states | AL | 09.02.2005 | LT | 09.02.2005 | LV | 09.02.2005 | MK | 09.02.2005 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR DIE FUNKACKTIVIERUNG UND -MODIFIZIERUNG VON EINEM MOBILTELEFON | [2005/15] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF OVER-THE-AIR ACTIVATION AND MODIFICATION OF A MOBILE PHONE | [2005/15] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ACTIVATION PAR LIAISON RADIO | [2005/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 09.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/17] | Public notification(s) | NOTING OF LOSS OF RIGHTS PURSUANT TO RULE 69(1) EPC OF 240105 | Mobile Operandi Communications Corp. 301-1110 Hamilton Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6B 2S2 / CA | [2005/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.02.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | 09.02.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.02.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   09.02.2005 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2012/32] |
Former [2006/16] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 23.02.2006 | ||
[2012/32] | Cited in | International search | [X]US5761646 (FRID-NIELSEN MARTIN [US], et al) [X] 4,5 * column 7, line 9 - line 33; figure 6; claim 1 ** column 3, line 8 - line 22 *; | [A]WO0157716 (EZLOGIN COM INC [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * claim 1 *; | [X]US6295291 (LARKINS JOHN P [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 4 - column 29 * * column 5, line 20 - line 65 * * column 6, line 40 - line 46 * | by applicant | US6295291 | US6421717 | US20020372731 |