EP1483173 - PACKING UNIT FOR A SINGLE OR MULTI-COMPONENT END PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANNE, Ulrike Escher Strasse 85 50259 Pulheim / DE | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Hans Heiderstrasse 79 41844 Wegberg / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Manfred Kleine Pfahlstrasse 16 30161 Hannover / DE | [2004/50] | Application number, filing date | 03714812.9 | 12.03.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003EP02563 | Priority number, date | DE20021011303 | 13.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10211303 | DE20021017970 | 22.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10217970 | [2004/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03076301 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1483173 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483173 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
B65D81/3211 (EP);
B65D75/32 (EP);
B65D2575/3254 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EIN EIN- BZW. MEHRKOMPONENTEN-ENDPROD UKT | [2013/24] | English: | PACKING UNIT FOR A SINGLE OR MULTI-COMPONENT END PRODUCT | [2004/50] | French: | UNITE D'EMBALLAGE POUR UN PRODUIT FINAL A UN OU PLUSIEURS CONSTITUANTS | [2004/50] |
Former [2004/50] | VERPACKUNGSEINHEIT F R EIN EIN- BZW. MEHRKOMPONENTEN-ENDPROD UKT | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2003 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | IT | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | GR | 24.01.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | AT | 12.03.2014 | IE | 12.03.2014 | LU | 12.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.03.2003 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BG | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH11227844 ; | [A]US3343897 (WALTHER KELLER PIERRE) [A] 37,45* figure - *; | [X]FR1591549 (RICHARDSON-MERREL) [X] 1-8,10,19,31-34,36 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2283064 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,31,35,36 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2290366 (CONTRAPAC [FR]) [X] 56-58 * the whole document *; | [X]US5529179 (HANSON CLAUDIA J [US]) [X] 56-58 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0010887 (IGGULDEN JERRY [US]) [X] 56-58 * page 9, paragraph 2; figure 5 *; | [X]GB2364699 (SIMS ASHLEY [GB], et al) [X] 1,56-58 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002179461 (MOLLSTAM BO [SE], et al) [X] 56-58 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11227844 A 19990824 (NISSHO CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | Examination | JPH02124870U | JP2001139034 | NL1027456C | by applicant | DE2329704 | DE2539291 | EP0563934 | US6443307 | DE10211303 | - Verpackungshandbuch, AUGSBURG,, VERLAG FOR CHEM INDUST, (1999), pages 211-213 - 388-413 | DE20021008874 | DE20021008875 |