Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8236947 | ![]() | 07.08.2012 | B2 | US2011237792 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50907804 | 27.09.2004 | US54145609 | 14.08.2009 | US84703910 | 30.07.2010 | US20507908 | 05.09.2008 | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | US201113152356 | 03.06.2011 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7977337 | ![]() | 12.07.2011 | B2 | US2010305107 | 02.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50907804 | 27.09.2004 | US54145609 | 14.08.2009 | US84703910 | 30.07.2010 | US20507908 | 05.09.2008 | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7799774 | ![]() | 21.09.2010 | B2 | US2009298841 | 03.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50907804 | 27.09.2004 | US54145609 | 14.08.2009 | US20507908 | 05.09.2008 | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7601837 | ![]() | 13.10.2009 | B2 | US2009036682 | 05.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50907804 | 27.09.2004 | US20507908 | 05.09.2008 | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7452888 | ![]() | 18.11.2008 | B2 | US2005124628 | 09.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101020399B | ![]() | 08.03.2011 | B1 | KR20040094874 | 10.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4455064B | ![]() | 21.04.2010 | B2 | JP2005531518 | 20.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1956004 | ![]() | 13.06.2012 | B1 | EP1956004 | 13.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03714889 | 25.03.2003 | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003219103B | ![]() | 23.10.2008 | B2 | AU2003219103 | 08.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1497266 | ![]() | 11.06.2008 | B1 | EP1497266 | 19.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0308696 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0308696 | 16.07.2019 | B1 | BRPI0308696 | 11.04.2017 | A8 | BR0308696 | 25.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2479786 | 29.11.2011 | C | CA2479786 | 02.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1108313T | 12.02.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03714889 | 25.03.2003 | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1113306T | 13.04.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP08157490 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60321558D1 | 24.07.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1497266T | 06.10.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1956004T | 06.08.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP03714889 | 25.03.2003 | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0207289D0 | 08.05.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0225678D0 | 11.12.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1074439 | 11.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL164108 | 31.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS2599B | 15.04.2010 | B | IS7470 | 24.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04009318 | 25.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO329319B | 27.09.2010 | B1 | NO20044588L | 25.10.2004 | L | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ535239 | 28.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2309154 | 27.09.2016 | C9 | RU2309154 | 27.10.2007 | C2 | RU2004131641 | 27.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1497266T | 31.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03714889 | 25.03.2003 | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1956004T | 28.09.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP08157490 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200407320 | 30.11.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | EP0303197 | 25.03.2003 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03080580 | ![]() | 05.02.2004 | A3 | WO03080580 | 02.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5091913B | ![]() | 05.12.2012 | B2 | JP2009235080 | 15.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR039127 | 09.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE398108T | 15.07.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1315809C | 16.05.2007 | C | CN1656075 | 17.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2307919T | 01.12.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2386828T | 31.08.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY138836 | 31.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL209872B | 31.10.2011 | B1 | PL374378 | 17.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1497266E | 10.09.2008 | E | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1956004E | 31.08.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI268928B | 21.12.2006 | B | TW200403224 | 01.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0207289 | 27.03.2002 | GB0225678 | 04.11.2002 | Type | ![]() | EP1956004 |