EP1492796 - SUBSTITUTED AMINO ISOXAZOLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTI-DEPRESSANTS. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRÉS-GIL, José, Igancio Janssen-Cilag S.A. Calle Jarama (S/N), Poligono Industrial E-45007 Toledo / ES | 02 /
ALCÁZAR-VACA, Manuel, Jesú Janssen-Cilag S.A. Calle Jarama (S/N), Poligono Industrial E- 45007 Toledo / ES | 03 /
BAKKER, Margaretha Henrica Maria Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 04 /
DE LUCAS OLIVARES, Ana, Isabel Janssen-Cilag SA Calle Jarama (S/N), Poligono Industrial E-45007 Toledo / ES | [2007/36] |
Former [2005/16] | 01 /
Andres-Gil, José, Janssen-Cilag S.A. Calle Jarama (S/N), Poligono Industrial E-45007 Toledo / ES | ||
02 /
Alcazar-Vaca, M., Janssen-Cilag S.A. Calle Jarama (S/N), Poligono Industrial E- 45007 Toledo / ES | |||
03 /
Bakker, Margaretha Henrica Maria Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | |||
04 /
De Lucas Olivares, A., Janssen-Cilag SA Calle Jarama (S/N), Poligono Industrial E-45007 Toledo / ES | |||
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
Andres-Gil, José, Janssen-Cilag S.A., Edif. J.&J. P/ de las Doce Estrellas 5-7, Campo de Naciones E-28042 Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
Alcazar-Vaca, M., Janssen-Cilag S.A., Edif. J.&J. P/o de las Doce Estrella5-7, Campo de Naciones E- 28042 Madrid / ES | |||
03 /
Bakker, Margaretha Henrica Maria Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | |||
04 /
De Lucas Olivares, A., Janssen-Cilag SA, Edif. J&J P/o de las Doce Estrellas 5-7, Campo de Naciones E-28042 Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | Daelemans, Frank F.R., et al Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. J&J Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2007/43] |
Former [2005/01] | Van Borm, Werner, et al Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. J & J Patent Law Department Beerse Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 03714897.0 | 27.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003EP03245 | Priority number, date | EP20020076239 | 02.04.2002 Original published format: EP 02076239 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03082878 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1492796 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492796 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04, C07D498/14, C07D261/20, A61K31/424, A61K31/5383, C07D311/00 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
C07D498/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | 02.11.2004 | LT | 02.11.2004 | LV | 02.11.2004 | MK | 02.11.2004 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE AMINOISOXAZOLINDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTIDEPRESSIVA | [2005/01] | English: | SUBSTITUTED AMINO ISOXAZOLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS ANTI-DEPRESSANTS. | [2005/01] | French: | DERIVES D'AMINO ISOXAZOLINE SUBSTITUES ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI EN TANT QU'ANTIDEPRESSEURS | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 25.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.09.2007 | CZ | 05.09.2007 | EE | 05.09.2007 | FI | 05.09.2007 | SI | 05.09.2007 | SK | 05.09.2007 | BG | 05.12.2007 | HU | 06.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 05.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9725317 (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL INC [US]) [Y] 1-7,9-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0885883 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [Y] 1-7,9-18 * the whole document, particularly examples 97, 98 and 105 *; | [PX]WO02066484 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [PX] 1-7,9-18* the whole document *; | [X] - O'NEIL M J, SENIOR EDITOR, The Merck Index, thirteenth edition, WHITEHOUSE STATION, NJ, US, MERCK & CO., INC., (2001), XP002246908 [X] 15 * page 741, monography 4211 * |