EP1512125 - METHOD TO PAY WITH A SMART CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2019/08] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACKNER, Christian c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
EDER, Stefan c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2019/08] |
Former [2009/42] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/28] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1102 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2007/50] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1102 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2007/01] | Röggla, Harald, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Triester Strasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2005/10] | Röggla, Harald Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Triesterstrasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 03715275.8 | 23.04.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003IB01723 | Priority number, date | EP20020100474 | 10.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02100474 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03096286 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1512125 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512125 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/02, G07F7/08 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
G07F7/0866 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G07B15/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEZAHLEN MIT EINER CHIPKARTE | [2005/10] | English: | METHOD TO PAY WITH A SMART CARD | [2005/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PAIEMENT AU MOYEN D'UNE CARTE INTELLIGENTE | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 07.05.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 05.07.2012 | Appeal received No. T2052/12 | 31.08.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.01.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 09.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.01.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2003 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | ES | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | IE | 23.04.2019 | LU | 23.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | GB | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 23.04.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GB | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 23.04.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GB | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 23.04.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.04.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 20.02.2019 | |
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
PT | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2503423 (FLONIC SA [FR]) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 1 - line 18 * * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 12 * * page 6, line 1 - line 29 * * page 8, line 6 - line 18 * * page 11, line 15 - line 32 *; | [A]US4822984 (REMERY PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1-13* column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 30 *; | [DA]WO9730421 (POM INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 35 * * page 5, line 14 - line 20 *; | [A]US2002019807 (HALPERN JOHN W [GB]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0043] * * paragraphs [0068] , [0069] * * paragraphs [0091] - [0094] - [0098] - [0101] * * paragraphs [0108] - [0110] * * paragraphs [0136] , [0137] * | by applicant | FR2503423 | US4822984 | US2002019807 |