EP1491211 - REMEDY FOR GLIOBLASTOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. No. 3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIUCHI, Shogo 13-7, Furuichi-cho 1-chome Maebashi-shi, Gunma 371-0844 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03715539.7 | 27.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP03867 | Priority number, date | JP20020094313 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002094313 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03082332 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491211 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/498, A61K31/542, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07D241/38, C07D403/04, C07D513/04 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/542 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GLIOBLASTOM | [2005/01] | English: | REMEDY FOR GLIOBLASTOMA | [2005/01] | French: | MEDICAMENT CONTRE LE GLIOBLASTOME | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2004 | Translation filed | 20.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 26.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 25.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0024395 (IKONOMIDOU HRISSANTHI [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-11 * page 7, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 16, paragraphs 1,4-6 * * claims 1,5,9 *; | [X] - ISHIUCHI ET AL, "A CRUCIAL ROLE OF CA2+-PERMEABLE AMPA RECEPTORS IN HUMAN GLIOBLASTOMA CELLS", JIKKEN IGAKU - EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, YODOSHA, TOKYO, JP, (20020101), vol. 20, no. 18, ISSN 0288-5514, pages 2651 - 2653, XP008070096 [X] 1,3,5,7,9,11 * the whole document * | [DX] - RZESKI W ET AL, "Glutamate antagonists limit tumor growth", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20010522), vol. 98, no. 11, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6372 - 6377, XP002968567 [DX] 1,3,5,7,9,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.091113598 | [DY] - LABRAKAKIS C ET AL, "Glutamate receptor activation can trigger electrical activity in human glioma cells.", THE EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE JUN 1998, (199806), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 0953-816X, pages 2153 - 2162, XP002558225 [DY] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1460-9568.1998.00226.x | [DY] - ROTHSTEIN J D ET AL, "Excitotoxic destruction facilitates brain tumor growth", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010101), vol. 7, no. 9, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 994 - 995, XP002490995 [DY] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0901-994 | [Y] - ISHIUCHI S ET AL, "Extension of glial processes by activation of Ca2+-permeable AMPA receptor channels", NEUROREPORT, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (20010326), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 0959-4965, pages 745 - 748, XP002974830 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00001756-200103260-00026 | [Y] - YE Z-C ET AL, "Glioma cells release excitotoxic concentrations of glutamate", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD., US, (19990901), vol. 59, no. 17, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4383 - 4391, XP002331150 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO9610023 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO9717970 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO0054772 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR], et al); | [AP]WO03000928 (ODIN MEDICAL AS [DK], et al); | [Y] - TAKANO T. ET AL., "Glutamate relkated promotes growth of malignant gliomas", NATURE MEDICINE, (2001), vol. 7, no. 9, pages 1010 - 1015, XP002970005 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0901-1010 | [Y] - FLORIAN CATARINA L. ET AL., "Characteristic metabolic profiles reveald by 1H NMR spectroscopy of three types of human brain and nervous system tumours", NMR IN BIOMEDICINE, (1996), vol. 8, pages 253 - 264, XP002970006 | [XP] - ISHIUCHI S. ET AL., "Blockage of Ca2+-permeable AMPA receptors suppresses migration and induces apoptosis in human glioblastoma cells", NATURE MEDICINE, (200209), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 971 - 978, XP002970007 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm746 |