EP1493722 - SILICON CARBIDE BASED POROUS MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tabuchi, Yuuichirou, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
Furukawa, Masahiro, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
Morimoto, Kenji, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 04 /
Kawasaki, Shinji, NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03715654.4 | 31.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP04086 | Priority number, date | JP20020097260 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002097260 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03082770 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493722 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493722 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/565, C04B38/08, B01J35/04, F01N3/022, B01D39/20, B01D53/94 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
C04B35/565 (EP,KR,US);
B01D39/2075 (EP,US);
B01D53/94 (EP,US);
C04B35/6263 (EP,US);
C04B38/02 (EP,US);
C04B38/061 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
F01N3/2803 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2111/2084 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3463 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3481 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP,US);
C04B2235/428 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6021 (EP,US);
C04B2235/668 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9684 (EP,US);
F01N2330/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/02, C04B35/565 (US,EP);
C04B38/061, C04B35/565, C04B38/0006, C04B38/0051 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2005/01] | C04B35/565, C04B38/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/20] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF SILICIUMCARBID BASIERENDES PORÖSES MATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/01] | English: | SILICON CARBIDE BASED POROUS MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2005/01] | French: | MATIERE POREUSE A BASE DE CARBURE DE SILICIUM ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2004 | Translation filed | 15.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11253722 ; | [Y]US4777152 (TSUKADA KIYOTAKA [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 10 - line 33 * * column 2, line 28 - line 38 * * column 3, line 36 - line 62 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 2 * * column 8, line 47 - column 9, line 28 * * examples 7,8 * * claim 4 *; | [A]EP0322998 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 1 - line 25 * * page 4, line 11 - line 12 * * example 1 * * claims 4,9 *; | [A]EP0575038 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 35 - line 49 * * page 4, line 7 - line 35 * * claim - *; | [A]US5326512 (STILLWAGON THOMAS L [US], et al) [A] 10-17 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1070687 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * claim - *; | [PA]WO02062726 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al)[PA] 1-17; | [E]EP1364930 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-17 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020] - [0027] , [0032] , [0034] - [0042] - [0046] * * table 1 * * claims 1,13 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11253722 A 19990921 (NGK INSULATORS LTD; NGK ADRECH KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * cf. also Japanese application: * * example - * | International search | [A]JP2001014673 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]WO0153233 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2001206785 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [AP]JP2002154882 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [AP]JP2002356384 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) |