EP1493159 - REFRESH SCHEME FOR DYNAMIC PAGE PROGRAMMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spansion LLC 915 DeGuigne Drive P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088-3453 / US | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Spansion, Inc 915 DeGuigne Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94088-3453 / US | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE, Binh, Q. 1277 Crestpoint Drive San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 02 /
CHUNG, Michael 1433 Royal Ann Court San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Pau-Ling 12947 Arroyo de Arguello Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03716045.4 | 14.02.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US04610 | Priority number, date | US20020119273 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: US 119273 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088259 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493159 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493159 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/04, G11C16/28 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G11C16/3431 (EP,US);
G11C16/04 (KR);
G11C16/10 (KR);
G11C16/28 (KR);
G11C16/3418 (EP,US);
G11C16/0475 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/44] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFFRISCHSCHEMA FÜR DIE DYNAMISCHE SEITENPROGRAMMIERUNG | [2005/01] | English: | REFRESH SCHEME FOR DYNAMIC PAGE PROGRAMMING | [2005/01] | French: | SCHEMA DE RAFRAICHISSEMENT POUR PROGRAMMATION DYNAMIQUE DE PAGES | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 10.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.03.2010 | [2011/07] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5163021 (MEHROTRA SANJAY [US], et al); | [A]US5754475 (BILL COLIN [US], et al); | [A]US6310811 (KOHNO TAKAKI [JP]) |