Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7790215 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2010 | B2 | US2003190362 | 09.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US40111103 | 26.03.2003 | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4790219B | Global Dossier | 12.10.2011 | B2 | JP2006508021 | 09.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US0309420 | 26.03.2003 | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003220551 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2003 | A8 | AU2003220551 | 13.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0309420 | 26.03.2003 | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1578350 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2009 | B1 | EP1578350 | 22.03.2006 | A4 | EP1578350 | 28.09.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0309420 | 26.03.2003 | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE432065T | 15.06.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0309420 | 26.03.2003 | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1109332T | 02.07.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03716865 | 26.03.2003 | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60327807D1 | 09.07.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0309420 | 26.03.2003 | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1578350T | 10.08.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0309420 | 26.03.2003 | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1578350T | 31.10.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03716865 | 26.03.2003 | US0309420 | 26.03.2003 | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03082204 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2007 | A3 | WO03082204 | 09.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5323134B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2013 | B2 | JP2011201912 | 13.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2327034T | 23.10.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1578350E | 27.08.2009 | E | Priority number | Date | US36783202 | 26.03.2002 |