EP1578350 - SUSTAINED-RELEASE GEL COATED COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 2, avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | [2008/23] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Euro-Celtique S.A. 122 Boulevard de la Pétrusse 2330 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACKLER, Richard, S. 25 Windrose, Way Greenwich, CT 06830 / US | 02 /
OSHLACK, Benjamin 351 East 84th Street New York, NY 10028 / US | 03 /
WRIGHT, Curtis 1 Jarvis Street Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Maiwald, Walter, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03716865.5 | 26.03.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003US09420 | Priority number, date | US20020367832P | 26.03.2002 Original published format: US 367832 P | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03082204 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1578350 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1578350 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/22, A61K9/24, A61K9/26, A61K9/48, A61K9/52, A61K9/54 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K9/1658 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61K9/2873 (EP,US);
A61K9/5078 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/12] | A61K9/16, A61K9/28, A61K9/50, A61K31/485 | ||
Former IPC [2005/39] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | GELBESCHICHTETE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG | [2005/39] | English: | SUSTAINED-RELEASE GEL COATED COMPOSITIONS | [2005/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS RECOUVERTES DE GEL A LIBERATION SOUTENUE | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0419121 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,5,8 * claims 1-11 ** page 1, line 10 - page 3, line 45 *; | [X]US5653993 (GHANTA SAMBASIVA RAO [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8 * claims 1-11 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 55 * * examples 1,3 *; | [X]WO0048574 (BERWIND PHARMA SERVICE [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8 * claims 1-45 * * page 6 - page 9 * | International search | [A]US6277384 (KAIKO ROBERT F [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0419121 | US5653993 | WO0048574 |