EP1513675 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING CIGARETTE FILTERS WITH A CENTRALLY LOCATED FLAVORED ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANIER, Robert, C., Jr. 4240 Hunters Ridge Dr. Moseley, VA 23120 / US | 02 /
CAMPBELL, Steven, M. 8341 Reeds Grove lane Mechanicsville, VA 23116 / US | 03 /
BELLAMAH, Stephen, J. 1930 Corner Rock Rd. Midlothian, VA 23113 / US | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2005/11] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03716891.1 | 31.03.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003US09648 | Priority number, date | US20020368376P | 29.03.2002 Original published format: US 368376 P | US20030397275 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: US 397275 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03082558 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513675 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513675 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/02 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
A24D3/022 (EP,US);
Y10S493/941 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/11] | B31C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | LT | 25.10.2004 | LV | 25.10.2004 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZIGARETTENFILTERN MIT EINEM ZENTRAL ANGEORDNETEN GESCHMACKSELEMENT | [2005/11] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING CIGARETTE FILTERS WITH A CENTRALLY LOCATED FLAVORED ELEMENT | [2005/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION DE FILTRES DE CIGARETTE COMPRENANT UN ELEMENT AROMATISE AU CENTRE DE CEUX-CI | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 27.12.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12156378.7 / EP2468115 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.12.2004 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | BG   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | CZ   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | EE   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | HU   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | RO   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | SI   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | SK   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 | 27.12.2004 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2012 | BE | 22.02.2012 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | IE | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | LU | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
IE | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
IE | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 23.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH661412 (BAUMGARTNER PAPIERS SA) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US4770193 (PRYOR JAMES W [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US4971078 (DEUTSCH LANCE J [US], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4281671 (BYNRE STANLEY W, et al); | [A]US4661090 (ARTHUR HUGH M [GB]); | [A]US4768526 (PRYOR JAMES W [US]); | [A]US4798570 (JURKIEWITSCH GEORGE [US]) |